Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Recordings -see also- Video

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0043
Title
Criminal Procedure - Cameras in the Courtroom - Criminal Sentencing Hearings
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0046
Title
Baltimore City - Criminal Procedure - Cameras in the Courtroom - Criminal Sentencing Hearings
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0054
Title
Baltimore City Public Schools - Health and Safety - Video Cameras
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0169 (SB0091)
Title
State Board of Elections - Open Meetings - Audio Recordings and Documents (State Board of Elections Transparency Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0483
Title
Criminal Procedure - Victims and Witnesses - Out of Court Statement of Child Victim
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0536
Title
Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring, Work Zone Speed Control, and Traffic Control Signal Monitoring Systems - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0726
Title
Office of Cemetery Oversight - Cemetery Financial Statement - Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0843 (SB0635)
Title
Task Force to Study the Adoption of Enforcement Tools to Record Video of Illegal Cell Phone Use While Driving
Sponsor
Delegate Folden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0849 (SB0615)
Title
Courts - Physical Invasion of Privacy - Civil Cause of Action
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0933
Title
General Assembly - Live and Archived Video Streaming of Meetings
Sponsor
Delegate Szeliga
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1445 (SB0775)
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Cigar Shop Licenses
Sponsor
Delegate Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1518
Title
Interception of Communication - Financial Institutions
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0091 (HB0169)
Title
State Board of Elections - Open Meetings - Video Streaming and Recording (State Board of Elections Transparency Act)
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0615 (HB0849)
Title
Courts - Physical Invasion of Privacy - Civil Cause of Action
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0635 (HB0843)
Title
Task Force to Study the Adoption of Enforcement Tools to Record Video of Illegal Cell Phone Use While Driving
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0775 (HB1445)
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Tobacconist License
Sponsor
Harford County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1034 /CH0816
Title
Maryland Public Broadcasting Commission - Funding and Video Streaming
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0043 Criminal Procedure - Cameras in the Courtroom - Criminal Sentencing Hearings Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
1/25/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0046 Baltimore City - Criminal Procedure - Cameras in the Courtroom - Criminal Sentencing Hearings Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
1/25/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0054 Baltimore City Public Schools - Health and Safety - Video Cameras Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB0169 (SB0091) State Board of Elections - Open Meetings - Audio Recordings and Documents (State Board of Elections Transparency Act) Delegate Korman 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Health and Government Operations
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0483 Criminal Procedure - Victims and Witnesses - Out of Court Statement of Child Victim Delegate Wilson, B. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0536 Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring, Work Zone Speed Control, and Traffic Control Signal Monitoring Systems - Repeal Delegate Miller, W. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0726 Office of Cemetery Oversight - Cemetery Financial Statement - Requirements Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0843 (SB0635) Task Force to Study the Adoption of Enforcement Tools to Record Video of Illegal Cell Phone Use While Driving Delegate Folden 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0849 (SB0615) Courts - Physical Invasion of Privacy - Civil Cause of Action Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0933 General Assembly - Live and Archived Video Streaming of Meetings Delegate Szeliga 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1445 (SB0775) Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Cigar Shop Licenses Delegate Reilly 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1518 Interception of Communication - Financial Institutions Delegate Adams 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0091 (HB0169) State Board of Elections - Open Meetings - Video Streaming and Recording (State Board of Elections Transparency Act) Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/19 at 2:15 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/19/2017 - 2:15 PM
SB0615 (HB0849) Courts - Physical Invasion of Privacy - Civil Cause of Action Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0635 (HB0843) Task Force to Study the Adoption of Enforcement Tools to Record Video of Illegal Cell Phone Use While Driving Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0775 (HB1445) Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Tobacconist License Harford County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1034 /CH0816 Maryland Public Broadcasting Commission - Funding and Video Streaming Senator King 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 816
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:49 PM