Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Recycling

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0240 (SB0056)
Title
Environment - Solid Waste Management Practices - Maryland Recycling and Landfill Diversion Task Force
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0473 (SB0787)
Title
Economic Development - Green Business Incentive Zones
Sponsor
Delegate Summers
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0629 /CH0604
Title
Environmentally Preferable Procurement - Maryland Green Purchasing Committee
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0718 (SB0707)
Title
Community Cleanup and Greening Act of 2014
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0878 /CH0430 (SB0814)
Title
State Highway Administration - Compost and Compost-Based Products - Specification
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0056 (HB0240)
Title
Environment - Solid Waste Management Practices - Maryland Recycling and Landfill Diversion Task Force
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0394
Title
Statewide Container Recycling Refund Program
Sponsor
Senator Frosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0707 (HB0718)
Title
Community Cleanup and Greening Act of 2014
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0781 /CH0338
Title
Environment - Recycling - Special Events
Sponsor
Senator Montgomery
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0787 (HB0473)
Title
Economic Development - Green Business Incentive Zones
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0814 (HB0878/CH0430)
Title
State Highway Administration - Compost and Compost-Based Products - Specification
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0240 (SB0056) Environment - Solid Waste Management Practices - Maryland Recycling and Landfill Diversion Task Force Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Economic Matters
2/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0473 (SB0787) Economic Development - Green Business Incentive Zones Delegate Summers 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB0629 /CH0604 Environmentally Preferable Procurement - Maryland Green Purchasing Committee Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 604
Health and Government Operations
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0718 (SB0707) Community Cleanup and Greening Act of 2014 Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Environmental Matters)
Environmental Matters
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB0878 /CH0430 (SB0814) State Highway Administration - Compost and Compost-Based Products - Specification Delegate Stein 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 430
Environmental Matters
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/19/2014 - 1:45 PM
SB0056 (HB0240) Environment - Solid Waste Management Practices - Maryland Recycling and Landfill Diversion Task Force Senator Middleton 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0394 Statewide Container Recycling Refund Program Senator Frosh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0707 (HB0718) Community Cleanup and Greening Act of 2014 Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0781 /CH0338 Environment - Recycling - Special Events Senator Montgomery 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 338
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0787 (HB0473) Economic Development - Green Business Incentive Zones Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0814 (HB0878/CH0430) State Highway Administration - Compost and Compost-Based Products - Specification Senator Raskin 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Budget and Taxation
3/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:42 PM