Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Recycling

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0551 (SB0620)
Title
Community Cleanup and Greening Act of 2015
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0603
Title
Yard Waste and Food Residuals Diversion and Infrastructure Task Force
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0815 (SB0694/CH0193)
Title
Income Tax Credit - Oyster Shell Recycling - Credit Amount
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0982 (SB0684)
Title
Maryland Redeemable Beverage Container and Litter Reduction Program
Sponsor
Delegate Frush
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1202
Title
Highway Construction and Maintenance - Use of Recycled Aggregate
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0509
Title
Northeast Maryland Waste Disposal Authority - Purpose, Appointments, and Compensation
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0620 (HB0551)
Title
Community Cleanup and Greening Act of 2015
Sponsor
Senator Montgomery
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0684 (HB0982)
Title
Maryland Redeemable Beverage Container and Litter Reduction Program
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0694 /CH0193 (HB0815)
Title
Income Tax Credit - Oyster Shell Recycling - Credit Amount
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0551 (SB0620) Community Cleanup and Greening Act of 2015 Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB0603 Yard Waste and Food Residuals Diversion and Infrastructure Task Force Delegate Robinson, S. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0815 (SB0694/CH0193) Income Tax Credit - Oyster Shell Recycling - Credit Amount Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Ways and Means
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0982 (SB0684) Maryland Redeemable Beverage Container and Litter Reduction Program Delegate Frush 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB1202 Highway Construction and Maintenance - Use of Recycled Aggregate Delegate Beidle 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0509 Northeast Maryland Waste Disposal Authority - Purpose, Appointments, and Compensation Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0620 (HB0551) Community Cleanup and Greening Act of 2015 Senator Montgomery 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0684 (HB0982) Maryland Redeemable Beverage Container and Litter Reduction Program Senator Ferguson 2 2 In the Senate - Referred to interim study by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0694 /CH0193 (HB0815) Income Tax Credit - Oyster Shell Recycling - Credit Amount Senator Manno 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 193
Budget and Taxation
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:42 PM