Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Recycling

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0031 (SB0057)
Title
Community Cleanup and Greening Act of 2016
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0061
Title
Environment - Solid Waste, Recycling, and Anaerobic Digestion
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0126 (SB0131)
Title
Worcester County - Recycling at Special Events - Exemptions
Sponsor
Delegate Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0162
Title
Comptroller - Taxpayer Protection Act
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0287 (SB0068)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - New Horizons Disability Job Training and Recycling Center Phase II
Sponsor
Delegate Tarlau
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0332 (SB0201)
Title
Environment - Paint Stewardship Program
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0427 (SB0188)
Title
Income Tax - Oyster Shell Recycling - Credit Amount
Sponsor
Delegate Sophocleus
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0743
Title
Yard Waste and Food Residuals Diversion and Infrastructure Task Force
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0862 (SB0367)
Title
Maryland Redeemable Beverage Container Recycling Refund and Litter Reduction Act
Sponsor
Delegate Frush
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1117
Title
Environment - Mattress Stewardship Program
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1222 (SB0392)
Title
Dorchester County - Recycling at Special Events - Exemptions
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1328
Title
Environment - Lead and Mercury Wheel Weights - Prohibited
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1607 (SB1052/CH0025)
Title
University of Maryland Strategic Partnership Act of 2016
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0057 (HB0031)
Title
Community Cleanup and Greening Act of 2016
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0068 (HB0287)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - New Horizons Disability Job Training and Recycling Center Phase II
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0105
Title
Northeast Maryland Waste Disposal Authority - Name and Authority
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0131 (HB0126)
Title
Worcester County - Recycling at Special Events - Exemptions
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0188 (HB0427)
Title
Income Tax - Oyster Shell Recycling - Credit Amount
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0201 (HB0332)
Title
Environment - Paint Stewardship Program
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0367 (HB0862)
Title
Maryland Redeemable Beverage Container Recycling Refund and Litter Reduction Act
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0392 (HB1222)
Title
Dorchester County - Recycling at Special Events - Exemptions
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1052 /CH0025 (HB1607)
Title
University of Maryland Strategic Partnership Act of 2016
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0031 (SB0057) Community Cleanup and Greening Act of 2016 Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB0061 Environment - Solid Waste, Recycling, and Anaerobic Digestion Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Pinsky)
Environment and Transportation
1/27/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0126 (SB0131) Worcester County - Recycling at Special Events - Exemptions Delegate Carozza 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB0162 Comptroller - Taxpayer Protection Act Chair, Judiciary Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Judiciary
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0287 (SB0068) Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - New Horizons Disability Job Training and Recycling Center Phase II Delegate Tarlau 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/12/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0332 (SB0201) Environment - Paint Stewardship Program Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB0427 (SB0188) Income Tax - Oyster Shell Recycling - Credit Amount Delegate Sophocleus 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0743 Yard Waste and Food Residuals Diversion and Infrastructure Task Force Delegate Robinson, S. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0862 (SB0367) Maryland Redeemable Beverage Container Recycling Refund and Litter Reduction Act Delegate Frush 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB1117 Environment - Mattress Stewardship Program Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB1222 (SB0392) Dorchester County - Recycling at Special Events - Exemptions Delegate Adams 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB1328 Environment - Lead and Mercury Wheel Weights - Prohibited Delegate Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1607 (SB1052/CH0025) University of Maryland Strategic Partnership Act of 2016 Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0057 (HB0031) Community Cleanup and Greening Act of 2016 Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0068 (HB0287) Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - New Horizons Disability Job Training and Recycling Center Phase II Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 3:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/12/2016 - 3:00 PM
SB0105 Northeast Maryland Waste Disposal Authority - Name and Authority Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 In the House - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/19/2016 - 2:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0131 (HB0126) Worcester County - Recycling at Special Events - Exemptions Senator Mathias 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0188 (HB0427) Income Tax - Oyster Shell Recycling - Credit Amount Anne Arundel County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/03/2016 - 2:00 PM
SB0201 (HB0332) Environment - Paint Stewardship Program Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0367 (HB0862) Maryland Redeemable Beverage Container Recycling Refund and Litter Reduction Act Senator Ferguson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0392 (HB1222) Dorchester County - Recycling at Special Events - Exemptions Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1052 /CH0025 (HB1607) University of Maryland Strategic Partnership Act of 2016 Senator Ferguson 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 25
Budget and Taxation
3/01/2016 - 8:30 AM
Appropriations
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:47 PM