Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Recycling

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0066 /CH0385
Title
Environment - Lead and Mercury Wheel Weights - Prohibited
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0124 /CH0376
Title
Environment - Solid Waste and Recycling Facilities
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0674 (SB0168)
Title
Maryland Paint Stewardship Program
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0952 /CH0753 (SB0707/CH0752)
Title
Vehicle Law - Waste and Recycling Collection Vehicles - Use of Yellow and Amber Lights (The Senator Bob Hooper Sanitation Safety Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Healey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1026 (SB0114)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - New Horizons Disability Job Training and Recycling Center
Sponsor
Delegate Tarlau
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1070
Title
Department of the Environment - End-of-Life Management of Mattresses - Study
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1309 /CH0832 (SB0885/CH0833)
Title
Environment - Recycling - Special Events
Sponsor
Delegate Frush
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1349 /CH0374
Title
Environment - Compostable, Degradable, and Biodegradable Plastic Products - Labeling
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0114 (HB1026)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - New Horizons Disability Job Training and Recycling Center
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0168 (HB0674)
Title
Maryland Paint Stewardship Program
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0707 /CH0752 (HB0952/CH0753)
Title
Vehicle Law - Waste and Recycling Collection Vehicles - Use of Yellow and Amber Lights (The Senator Bob Hooper Sanitation Safety Act)
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0885 /CH0833 (HB1309/CH0832)
Title
Environment - Recycling - Special Events
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0066 /CH0385 Environment - Lead and Mercury Wheel Weights - Prohibited Delegate Lam 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 385
Environment and Transportation
1/25/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0124 /CH0376 Environment - Solid Waste and Recycling Facilities Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 376
Environment and Transportation
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0674 (SB0168) Maryland Paint Stewardship Program Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB0952 /CH0753 (SB0707/CH0752) Vehicle Law - Waste and Recycling Collection Vehicles - Use of Yellow and Amber Lights (The Senator Bob Hooper Sanitation Safety Act) Delegate Healey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 753
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1026 (SB0114) Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - New Horizons Disability Job Training and Recycling Center Delegate Tarlau 2 2 In the House - Hearing canceled
Appropriations
HB1070 Department of the Environment - End-of-Life Management of Mattresses - Study Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
2/24/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB1309 /CH0832 (SB0885/CH0833) Environment - Recycling - Special Events Delegate Frush 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 832
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1349 /CH0374 Environment - Compostable, Degradable, and Biodegradable Plastic Products - Labeling Delegate Robinson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 374
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/04/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0114 (HB1026) Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - New Horizons Disability Job Training and Recycling Center Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Budget and Taxation
SB0168 (HB0674) Maryland Paint Stewardship Program Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/31/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0707 /CH0752 (HB0952/CH0753) Vehicle Law - Waste and Recycling Collection Vehicles - Use of Yellow and Amber Lights (The Senator Bob Hooper Sanitation Safety Act) Senator Norman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 752
Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0885 /CH0833 (HB1309/CH0832) Environment - Recycling - Special Events Senator Rosapepe 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 833
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:49 PM