Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Recycling

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0109 /CH0579 (SB0285/CH0580)
Title
Environment – Expanded Polystyrene Food Service Products – Prohibitions
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0125
Title
Solar Photovoltaic Recycling
Sponsor
Delegate Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0134
Title
Environment - Single-Use Plastic Straws - Use in Restaurants
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0502
Title
Environment - Office of Recycling - Mattresses and Box Springs
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0510 /CH0366
Title
Organic Waste – Organics Recycling – Collection and Acceptance for Final Disposal
Sponsor
Delegate Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0539 /CH0368
Title
Environment - Reuse of Water Diverted From Septic Systems
Sponsor
Delegate Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1085
Title
Drug Manufacturers - Drug Take-Back Programs
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1142
Title
Environment - Hazardous Materials - Disposal of Synthetic Turf and Turf Infill
Sponsor
Delegate Lehman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1366 /CH0739 (SB0662/CH0740)
Title
Maryland Association of Environmental and Outdoor Education Grant (Maryland Green Schools Act of 2019)
Sponsor
Delegate Cain
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0183
Title
Recycling - Lodging Establishments - Notification to Guests
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0370 /CH0500
Title
Environment – Recycling – Office Buildings
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0662 /CH0740 (HB1366/CH0739)
Title
Maryland Association of Environmental and Outdoor Education Grant (Maryland Green Schools Act of 2019)
Sponsor
Senator Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0109 /CH0579 (SB0285/CH0580) Environment – Expanded Polystyrene Food Service Products – Prohibitions Delegate Lierman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 579
Environment and Transportation
2/06/2019 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0125 Solar Photovoltaic Recycling Delegate Miller 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
1/31/2019 - 1:30 PM
HB0134 Environment - Single-Use Plastic Straws - Use in Restaurants Delegate Love 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
HB0502 Environment - Office of Recycling - Mattresses and Box Springs Delegate Hill 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0510 /CH0366 Organic Waste – Organics Recycling – Collection and Acceptance for Final Disposal Delegate Cassilly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 366
Environment and Transportation
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0539 /CH0368 Environment - Reuse of Water Diverted From Septic Systems Delegate Cassilly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 368
Environment and Transportation
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1085 Drug Manufacturers - Drug Take-Back Programs Delegate Young, K. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1142 Environment - Hazardous Materials - Disposal of Synthetic Turf and Turf Infill Delegate Lehman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1366 /CH0739 (SB0662/CH0740) Maryland Association of Environmental and Outdoor Education Grant (Maryland Green Schools Act of 2019) Delegate Cain 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 739
Ways and Means
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0183 Recycling - Lodging Establishments - Notification to Guests Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0370 /CH0500 Environment – Recycling – Office Buildings Senator West 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 500
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0662 /CH0740 (HB1366/CH0739) Maryland Association of Environmental and Outdoor Education Grant (Maryland Green Schools Act of 2019) Senator Miller 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 740
Budget and Taxation
2/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:34 PM