Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Recycling

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0165
Title
Solar Photovoltaic Recycling
Sponsor
Delegate Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0179
Title
Maryland Recycling Act - Recyclable Materials and Resource Recovery Facilities - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0589
Title
Solid Waste Management - Organics Recycling and Waste Diversion - Food Residuals
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0890
Title
Maryland Paint Stewardship Program
Sponsor
Delegate Boyce
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0987
Title
Environment - Recycling - Hotels
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0988
Title
Environment - Business Recycling Reporting Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1452
Title
Department of the Environment – Office of Recycling – Recycling Market Development
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1538
Title
Environment - Waste Haulers - Reporting Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1547
Title
Environment - Synthetic Turf and Turf Infill - Producer Responsibility
Sponsor
Delegate Lehman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1643
Title
Environment - Organics Recycling and Composting - Grant Program
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, J.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0023
Title
Business Regulation - Trademarks, Service Marks, and Trade Names - Registration
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0891
Title
Environment - Solar Panel Stewardship Programs
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0928
Title
Environment – Concentrated Animal Feeding Operation Construction or Expansion – Manure Transport Plan Requirement
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0165 Solar Photovoltaic Recycling Delegate Miller 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/13/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0179 Maryland Recycling Act - Recyclable Materials and Resource Recovery Facilities - Alterations Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB0589 Solid Waste Management - Organics Recycling and Waste Diversion - Food Residuals Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0890 Maryland Paint Stewardship Program Delegate Boyce 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0987 Environment - Recycling - Hotels Delegate Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Economic Matters
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
HB0988 Environment - Business Recycling Reporting Requirements Delegate Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB1452 Department of the Environment – Office of Recycling – Recycling Market Development Delegate Stein 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1538 Environment - Waste Haulers - Reporting Requirement Delegate Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1547 Environment - Synthetic Turf and Turf Infill - Producer Responsibility Delegate Lehman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1643 Environment - Organics Recycling and Composting - Grant Program Delegate Lewis, J. 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0023 Business Regulation - Trademarks, Service Marks, and Trade Names - Registration Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Finance
1/16/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/16/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0891 Environment - Solar Panel Stewardship Programs Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0928 Environment – Concentrated Animal Feeding Operation Construction or Expansion – Manure Transport Plan Requirement Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/18/2020 4:57 PM