Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Referendum

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0084
Title
Constitutional Convention - Approval by Majority of Voters Voting on the Question - Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0345 (SB0423)
Title
Elective Franchise - Registration and Voting at Polling Place
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0348
Title
Montgomery County - Staggered Election Terms for Members of the County Council MC 4-17
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0361
Title
General Assembly - Special Election to Fill a Vacancy in Office
Sponsor
Delegate Tarlau
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0367
Title
Independent Congressional Redistricting Commission - Mid-Atlantic States Regional Districting Process
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0535
Title
House Legislative Districts - Single Member
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0552
Title
Transportation - Motor Fuel Tax and Highway User Revenue - Increased Local Share
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0579
Title
Circuit Court Judges - Election, Qualifications, and Term of Office
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0594
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Candidate Signs and Proposition Signs
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0706
Title
General Assembly - Limitation of Terms
Sponsor
Delegate Vogt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0724
Title
Circuit Court Judges - Election
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0766 (SB1003)
Title
State Officers - Year of Election
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0826
Title
Circuit Court Judges - Selection and Tenure
Sponsor
Delegate West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0966
Title
Legislative and Congressional Districting
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0989
Title
Gaming - Wagering on Sporting Events - Study and Implementation
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1236 (SB0891)
Title
Constitutional Amendment - Cannabis - Right to Use, Possess, and Cultivate
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1505
Title
Constitutional Amendment - Clarification of Referendum Process - Veto Override
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1585
Title
Baltimore County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Sales
Sponsor
Delegate Szeliga
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0423 (HB0345)
Title
Elective Franchise - Registration and Voting at Polling Place
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0690
Title
State Budget
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0862
Title
Environment - Hydraulic Fracturing - Moratorium and Referenda
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0891 (HB1236)
Title
Constitutional Amendment - Cannabis - Right to Use, Possess, and Cultivate
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1003 (HB0766)
Title
State Officers - Year of Election
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0084 Constitutional Convention - Approval by Majority of Voters Voting on the Question - Requirement Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0345 (SB0423) Elective Franchise - Registration and Voting at Polling Place Delegate Reznik 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0348 Montgomery County - Staggered Election Terms for Members of the County Council MC 4-17 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0361 General Assembly - Special Election to Fill a Vacancy in Office Delegate Tarlau 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0367 Independent Congressional Redistricting Commission - Mid-Atlantic States Regional Districting Process Delegate Reznik 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0535 House Legislative Districts - Single Member Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0552 Transportation - Motor Fuel Tax and Highway User Revenue - Increased Local Share Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0579 Circuit Court Judges - Election, Qualifications, and Term of Office Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB0594 Landlord and Tenant - Candidate Signs and Proposition Signs Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0706 General Assembly - Limitation of Terms Delegate Vogt 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0724 Circuit Court Judges - Election Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB0766 (SB1003) State Officers - Year of Election Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0826 Circuit Court Judges - Selection and Tenure Delegate West 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB0966 Legislative and Congressional Districting Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0989 Gaming - Wagering on Sporting Events - Study and Implementation Delegate Buckel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1236 (SB0891) Constitutional Amendment - Cannabis - Right to Use, Possess, and Cultivate Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1505 Constitutional Amendment - Clarification of Referendum Process - Veto Override Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; Withdrawn
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/10/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1585 Baltimore County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Sales Delegate Szeliga 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0423 (HB0345) Elective Franchise - Registration and Voting at Polling Place Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Senate Requests House Recede
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0690 State Budget Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 2:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/01/2017 - 2:30 PM
SB0862 Environment - Hydraulic Fracturing - Moratorium and Referenda Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0891 (HB1236) Constitutional Amendment - Cannabis - Right to Use, Possess, and Cultivate Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1003 (HB0766) State Officers - Year of Election Senator Manno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:49 PM