Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Refuse Disposal -see also- Recycling

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0184 /CH0279 (SB0484/CH0278)
Title
Income Tax Credit - Oyster Shell Recycling
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0197 (SB0271)
Title
Criminal Law - Illegal Dumping and Litter Control Law - Driver's License - Points
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0341 (SB0513)
Title
Environment - Hydraulic Fracturing Wastewater - Prohibited Acts
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0554 /CH0501 (SB0563/CH0500)
Title
Environment and Public Utilities - Notice to Neighboring Jurisdictions of Applications
Sponsor
Delegate Schuh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0807
Title
Environment - Landfill Operator - Completion of Training Course
Sponsor
Delegate Frush
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0959 (SB0676/CH0304)
Title
Governmental Procedures - Security and Protection of Information
Sponsor
Delegate Lee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1266 (SB0799)
Title
Energy - Landfill Diversion - Municipal Solid Waste Portfolio Standard
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1440 /CH0686
Title
Recycling - Composting Facilities
Sponsor
Chair, Environmental Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0271 (HB0197)
Title
Criminal Law - Illegal Dumping and Litter Control Law - Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Jones-Rodwell
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0484 /CH0278 (HB0184/CH0279)
Title
Income Tax Credit - Oyster Shell Recycling
Sponsor
Senator Dyson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0513 (HB0341)
Title
Environment - Hydraulic Fracturing Wastewater - Prohibited Acts
Sponsor
Senator Montgomery
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0563 /CH0500 (HB0554/CH0501)
Title
Environment and Public Utilities - Notice to Neighboring Jurisdictions of Applications
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0591
Title
Governmental Procedures - Protection of Personal Information
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0676 /CH0304 (HB0959)
Title
Governmental Procedures - Security and Protection of Information
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0799 (HB1266)
Title
Environment - Solid Waste Management Practices - Maryland Recycling and Landfill Diversion Task Force
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1049 /CH0602
Title
Recycling - Apartment Buildings and Condominiums - Ocean City
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0184 /CH0279 (SB0484/CH0278) Income Tax Credit - Oyster Shell Recycling Delegate Lafferty 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 279
Ways and Means
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2013 - 2:00 PM
HB0197 (SB0271) Criminal Law - Illegal Dumping and Litter Control Law - Driver's License - Points Delegate Anderson 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0341 (SB0513) Environment - Hydraulic Fracturing Wastewater - Prohibited Acts Delegate Robinson, S. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
3/08/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0554 /CH0501 (SB0563/CH0500) Environment and Public Utilities - Notice to Neighboring Jurisdictions of Applications Delegate Schuh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 501
Environmental Matters
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0807 Environment - Landfill Operator - Completion of Training Course Delegate Frush 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environmental Matters
2/22/2013 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0959 (SB0676/CH0304) Governmental Procedures - Security and Protection of Information Delegate Lee 4 2 In the Senate - Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Health and Government Operations
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1266 (SB0799) Energy - Landfill Diversion - Municipal Solid Waste Portfolio Standard Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1440 /CH0686 Recycling - Composting Facilities Chair, Environmental Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 686
Environmental Matters
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0271 (HB0197) Criminal Law - Illegal Dumping and Litter Control Law - Penalties Senator Jones-Rodwell 4 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0484 /CH0278 (HB0184/CH0279) Income Tax Credit - Oyster Shell Recycling Senator Dyson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 278
Budget and Taxation
2/27/2013 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0513 (HB0341) Environment - Hydraulic Fracturing Wastewater - Prohibited Acts Senator Montgomery 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0563 /CH0500 (HB0554/CH0501) Environment and Public Utilities - Notice to Neighboring Jurisdictions of Applications Senator Simonaire 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 500
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0591 Governmental Procedures - Protection of Personal Information Senator Pugh 4 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0676 /CH0304 (HB0959) Governmental Procedures - Security and Protection of Information Senator Pugh 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 304
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0799 (HB1266) Environment - Solid Waste Management Practices - Maryland Recycling and Landfill Diversion Task Force Senator Middleton 2 2 In the House - Rereferred to Economic Matters
Finance
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Economic Matters
SB1049 /CH0602 Recycling - Apartment Buildings and Condominiums - Ocean City Senator Mathias 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 602
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/04/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:41 PM