Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Refuse Disposal -see also- Recycling

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0030
Title
Contraband Tobacco Products and Conveyances - Seizures and Disposition
Sponsor
Delegate McDermott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0240 (SB0056)
Title
Environment - Solid Waste Management Practices - Maryland Recycling and Landfill Diversion Task Force
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0386 (SB0390/CH0493)
Title
Criminal Law - Illegal Dumping and Litter Control Law - Driver's License - Points
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0409
Title
Environment - Hydraulic Fracturing Wastewater - Prohibited Acts
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0473 (SB0787)
Title
Economic Development - Green Business Incentive Zones
Sponsor
Delegate Summers
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0718 (SB0707)
Title
Community Cleanup and Greening Act of 2014
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1081
Title
Composting and Anaerobic Digestion Facilities - Yard Waste and Food Residuals
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1210 (SB0706)
Title
Environment - Permit Determinations - Cumulative Impact Assessments
Sponsor
Delegate Swain
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1247 (SB0981)
Title
Baltimore County - Property Tax Credit - Homes Near a Refuse Disposal System
Sponsor
Delegate Szeliga
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1373
Title
Environment - Permits to Construct or Materially Alter an Incinerator - Limitations on Issuance
Sponsor
Delegate Niemann
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1506 /CH0459
Title
Wicomico County - Northeast Maryland Waste Disposal Authority
Sponsor
Delegate Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1539 (SB1096)
Title
Maryland Port Administration - Chesapeake and Delaware Canal - Dredged Material Containment Areas - Remediation Plan
Sponsor
Delegate Smigiel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0056 (HB0240)
Title
Environment - Solid Waste Management Practices - Maryland Recycling and Landfill Diversion Task Force
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0127 /CH0036
Title
Department of Agriculture - Manure Transportation Project
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0390 /CH0493 (HB0386)
Title
Criminal Law - Illegal Dumping and Litter Control Law - Driver's License - Points
Sponsor
Baltimore City Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0566
Title
Criminal Law - Littering - Mandatory Public Service
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0706 (HB1210)
Title
Environment - Permit Determinations - Cumulative Impact Assessments
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0707 (HB0718)
Title
Community Cleanup and Greening Act of 2014
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0787 (HB0473)
Title
Economic Development - Green Business Incentive Zones
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0981 (HB1247)
Title
Baltimore County - Property Tax Credit - Homes Near a Refuse Disposal System
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1096 (HB1539)
Title
Maryland Port Administration - Chesapeake and Delaware Canal - Dredged Material Containment Areas - Remediation Plan
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0030 Contraband Tobacco Products and Conveyances - Seizures and Disposition Delegate McDermott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
1/29/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0240 (SB0056) Environment - Solid Waste Management Practices - Maryland Recycling and Landfill Diversion Task Force Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Economic Matters
2/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0386 (SB0390/CH0493) Criminal Law - Illegal Dumping and Litter Control Law - Driver's License - Points Delegate Anderson 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judiciary
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0409 Environment - Hydraulic Fracturing Wastewater - Prohibited Acts Delegate Robinson, S. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0473 (SB0787) Economic Development - Green Business Incentive Zones Delegate Summers 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB0718 (SB0707) Community Cleanup and Greening Act of 2014 Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Environmental Matters)
Environmental Matters
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB1081 Composting and Anaerobic Digestion Facilities - Yard Waste and Food Residuals Delegate Robinson, S. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1210 (SB0706) Environment - Permit Determinations - Cumulative Impact Assessments Delegate Swain 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1247 (SB0981) Baltimore County - Property Tax Credit - Homes Near a Refuse Disposal System Delegate Szeliga 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1373 Environment - Permits to Construct or Materially Alter an Incinerator - Limitations on Issuance Delegate Niemann 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1506 /CH0459 Wicomico County - Northeast Maryland Waste Disposal Authority Delegate Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 459
Environmental Matters
3/14/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1539 (SB1096) Maryland Port Administration - Chesapeake and Delaware Canal - Dredged Material Containment Areas - Remediation Plan Delegate Smigiel 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0056 (HB0240) Environment - Solid Waste Management Practices - Maryland Recycling and Landfill Diversion Task Force Senator Middleton 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0127 /CH0036 Department of Agriculture - Manure Transportation Project Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 36
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/14/2014 - 3:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0390 /CH0493 (HB0386) Criminal Law - Illegal Dumping and Litter Control Law - Driver's License - Points Baltimore City Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 493
Judicial Proceedings
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0566 Criminal Law - Littering - Mandatory Public Service Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0706 (HB1210) Environment - Permit Determinations - Cumulative Impact Assessments Senator Benson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/02/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0707 (HB0718) Community Cleanup and Greening Act of 2014 Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0787 (HB0473) Economic Development - Green Business Incentive Zones Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0981 (HB1247) Baltimore County - Property Tax Credit - Homes Near a Refuse Disposal System Senator Jennings 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/02/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB1096 (HB1539) Maryland Port Administration - Chesapeake and Delaware Canal - Dredged Material Containment Areas - Remediation Plan Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:42 PM