Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Refuse Disposal -see also- Recycling

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0031 (SB0057)
Title
Community Cleanup and Greening Act of 2016
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0061
Title
Environment - Solid Waste, Recycling, and Anaerobic Digestion
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0090 /CH0093
Title
On-Site Sewage Disposal Systems - Operation and Maintenance Costs - Low-Income Homeowners
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0189 (SB0348)
Title
Environment - Liquid Waste Hauler - Vehicle License and Inspection
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0332 (SB0201)
Title
Environment - Paint Stewardship Program
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0599 (SB0496)
Title
Poultry Litter Management Act
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0670 /CH0274
Title
Baltimore City - Remediation of Illegal Dumping - Report
Sponsor
Delegate McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0743
Title
Yard Waste and Food Residuals Diversion and Infrastructure Task Force
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0821
Title
Energy Storage Portfolio Standard (Storage Technology and Electric Power (STEP) Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1117
Title
Environment - Mattress Stewardship Program
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0057 (HB0031)
Title
Community Cleanup and Greening Act of 2016
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0105
Title
Northeast Maryland Waste Disposal Authority - Name and Authority
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0201 (HB0332)
Title
Environment - Paint Stewardship Program
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0348 (HB0189)
Title
Environment - Liquid Waste Hauler - Vehicle License and Inspection
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0496 (HB0599)
Title
Poultry Litter Management Act
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0031 (SB0057) Community Cleanup and Greening Act of 2016 Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB0061 Environment - Solid Waste, Recycling, and Anaerobic Digestion Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Pinsky)
Environment and Transportation
1/27/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0090 /CH0093 On-Site Sewage Disposal Systems - Operation and Maintenance Costs - Low-Income Homeowners Delegate Lafferty 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 93
Environment and Transportation
2/03/2016 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0189 (SB0348) Environment - Liquid Waste Hauler - Vehicle License and Inspection Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0332 (SB0201) Environment - Paint Stewardship Program Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB0599 (SB0496) Poultry Litter Management Act Delegate Lam 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0670 /CH0274 Baltimore City - Remediation of Illegal Dumping - Report Delegate McCray 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 274
Environment and Transportation
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0743 Yard Waste and Food Residuals Diversion and Infrastructure Task Force Delegate Robinson, S. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0821 Energy Storage Portfolio Standard (Storage Technology and Electric Power (STEP) Act) Delegate Korman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1117 Environment - Mattress Stewardship Program Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0057 (HB0031) Community Cleanup and Greening Act of 2016 Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0105 Northeast Maryland Waste Disposal Authority - Name and Authority Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 In the House - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/19/2016 - 2:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0201 (HB0332) Environment - Paint Stewardship Program Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0348 (HB0189) Environment - Liquid Waste Hauler - Vehicle License and Inspection Senator Gladden 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0496 (HB0599) Poultry Litter Management Act Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:47 PM