Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Refuse Disposal -see also- Recycling

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0157
Title
State Highways - Electronic Map of Public Trash Receptacles
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0361 (SB0314)
Title
Bay Restoration Fund - Fee Exemption, Disbursements, and Financial Assistance (Septic Stewardship Act of 2018)
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0407 /CH0439 (SB0232/CH0440)
Title
Public Health - General Hospice Care Programs - Collection and Disposal of Unused Prescription Medication
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0601 (SB1255)
Title
Public Health - Opioids - Dispensing Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0850
Title
Solid Waste Management and Recycling – Mattresses and Box Springs
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1591
Title
Solar Facilities - Siting Standards
Sponsor
Delegate Impallaria
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1765 /CH0585
Title
On–Site Sewage Disposal Systems – Watershed Implementation Plan and Bay Restoration Fund Disbursements and Financial Assistance
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0232 /CH0440 (HB0407/CH0439)
Title
Public Health – General Hospice Care Programs – Collection and Disposal of Unused Prescription Medication
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0314 (HB0361)
Title
Bay Restoration Fund - Fee Exemption, Disbursements, and Financial Assistance (Septic Stewardship Act of 2018)
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1255 (HB0601)
Title
Public Health - Opioids - Dispensing Requirement
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0157 State Highways - Electronic Map of Public Trash Receptacles Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0361 (SB0314) Bay Restoration Fund - Fee Exemption, Disbursements, and Financial Assistance (Septic Stewardship Act of 2018) Speaker 3 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0407 /CH0439 (SB0232/CH0440) Public Health - General Hospice Care Programs - Collection and Disposal of Unused Prescription Medication Delegate Cullison 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 439
Health and Government Operations
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0601 (SB1255) Public Health - Opioids - Dispensing Requirement Delegate Hayes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0850 Solid Waste Management and Recycling – Mattresses and Box Springs Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB1591 Solar Facilities - Siting Standards Delegate Impallaria 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB1765 /CH0585 On–Site Sewage Disposal Systems – Watershed Implementation Plan and Bay Restoration Fund Disbursements and Financial Assistance Delegate Lafferty 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 585
Environment and Transportation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0232 /CH0440 (HB0407/CH0439) Public Health – General Hospice Care Programs – Collection and Disposal of Unused Prescription Medication Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 440
Finance
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0314 (HB0361) Bay Restoration Fund - Fee Exemption, Disbursements, and Financial Assistance (Septic Stewardship Act of 2018) President 3 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1255 (HB0601) Public Health - Opioids - Dispensing Requirement Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
3/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:53 PM