Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Registers of Wills

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0626 (SB0196/CH0029)
Title
Register of Wills - Salary
Sponsor
Delegate Mitchell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0658
Title
Estates and Trusts - Forms for Modified Administration
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0857 /CH0644
Title
Estates and Trusts - Posthumously Conceived Child
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1454
Title
Task Force to Study the Terms, Pay, Operations, and Ethical Standards for Various Elected Officials in Prince George's County PG 422-13
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0196 /CH0029 (HB0626)
Title
Register of Wills - Salary
Sponsor
Senator Frosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0649
Title
Estates and Trusts - Personal Representatives and Guardians - Standards
Sponsor
Senator Getty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0982
Title
Estates - Closing - Statement of Compensation and Reporting of Income (The Mike Cady Act)
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0626 (SB0196/CH0029) Register of Wills - Salary Delegate Mitchell 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judiciary
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0658 Estates and Trusts - Forms for Modified Administration Delegate Miller, W. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0857 /CH0644 Estates and Trusts - Posthumously Conceived Child Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 644
Judiciary
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1454 Task Force to Study the Terms, Pay, Operations, and Ethical Standards for Various Elected Officials in Prince George's County PG 422-13 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Environmental Matters
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/04/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0196 /CH0029 (HB0626) Register of Wills - Salary Senator Frosh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 29
Judicial Proceedings
1/29/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0649 Estates and Trusts - Personal Representatives and Guardians - Standards Senator Getty 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0982 Estates - Closing - Statement of Compensation and Reporting of Income (The Mike Cady Act) Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:41 PM