Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Registers of Wills

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0228 /CH0297 (SB0391/CH0296)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Registers of Wills - Records
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0656 (SB0321/CH0291)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Personal Representatives and Guardians - Standards
Sponsor
Delegate Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0999 /CH0106
Title
Code Revision - Miscellaneous Provisions
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0023
Title
Estates - Closing - Statement of Compensation and Reporting of Income (Mike Cady Act)
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0039
Title
Back Taxes - No Penalty, No Interest
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0319
Title
Elected Offices - Filling of Vacancies - Procedures
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0321 /CH0291 (HB0656)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Personal Representatives and Guardians - Standards
Sponsor
Senator Getty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0391 /CH0296 (HB0228/CH0297)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Registers of Wills - Records
Sponsor
Senator Frosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0228 /CH0297 (SB0391/CH0296) Estates and Trusts - Registers of Wills - Records Delegate Dumais 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 297
Judiciary
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0656 (SB0321/CH0291) Estates and Trusts - Personal Representatives and Guardians - Standards Delegate Ready 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judiciary
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0999 /CH0106 Code Revision - Miscellaneous Provisions Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 106
Health and Government Operations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0023 Estates - Closing - Statement of Compensation and Reporting of Income (Mike Cady Act) Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/21/2014 - 1:30 PM
SB0039 Back Taxes - No Penalty, No Interest Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Budget and Taxation
SB0319 Elected Offices - Filling of Vacancies - Procedures Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0321 /CH0291 (HB0656) Estates and Trusts - Personal Representatives and Guardians - Standards Senator Getty 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 291
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0391 /CH0296 (HB0228/CH0297) Estates and Trusts - Registers of Wills - Records Senator Frosh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 296
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:42 PM