Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Registers of Wills

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0081 (SB0445)
Title
Ethics Commission, Commission on Judicial Disabilities, Judicial Ethics Committee, and Joint Ethics Committee - Duties
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0592 (SB0415/CH0348)
Title
State Donor Registry - Information and Methods of Registration - Clerks of Circuit Courts, Registers of Wills, and Motor Vehicle Administration (Enhancing Organ Donation Rates Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0623 (SB0418/CH0030)
Title
Estates - Modified Administration - Final Report and Distribution - Extension
Sponsor
Delegate Miele
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0023
Title
Estates - Closing - Statement of Compensation and Reporting of Income (Mike Cady Act)
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0415 /CH0348 (HB0592)
Title
State Donor Registry - Information and Methods of Registration - Clerks of Circuit Courts, Registers of Wills, and Motor Vehicle Administration (Enhancing Organ Donation Rates Act)
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0418 /CH0030 (HB0623)
Title
Estates - Modified Administration - Final Report and Distribution - Extension
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0445 (HB0081)
Title
Ethics Commission, Judicial Ethics Committee, and Joint Ethics Committee - Duties
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0081 (SB0445) Ethics Commission, Commission on Judicial Disabilities, Judicial Ethics Committee, and Joint Ethics Committee - Duties Delegate Krebs 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0592 (SB0415/CH0348) State Donor Registry - Information and Methods of Registration - Clerks of Circuit Courts, Registers of Wills, and Motor Vehicle Administration (Enhancing Organ Donation Rates Act) Delegate Morhaim 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Health and Government Operations
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0623 (SB0418/CH0030) Estates - Modified Administration - Final Report and Distribution - Extension Delegate Miele 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Health and Government Operations
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0023 Estates - Closing - Statement of Compensation and Reporting of Income (Mike Cady Act) Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0415 /CH0348 (HB0592) State Donor Registry - Information and Methods of Registration - Clerks of Circuit Courts, Registers of Wills, and Motor Vehicle Administration (Enhancing Organ Donation Rates Act) Senator Kagan 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 348
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0418 /CH0030 (HB0623) Estates - Modified Administration - Final Report and Distribution - Extension Senator Lee 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 30
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0445 (HB0081) Ethics Commission, Judicial Ethics Committee, and Joint Ethics Committee - Duties Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:42 PM