Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Registers of Wills

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0624
Title
Montgomery County - Voting Methods MC 29-19
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1305 (SB0261/CH0224)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Administration of Estates - Waiver of Fees - Required
Sponsor
Delegate Ivey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0261 /CH0224 (HB1305)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Administration of Estates - Waiver of Fees - Required
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0398 /CH0197
Title
Code Revision - Estates and Trusts
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0735
Title
State Employees and Teachers - Cash Balance Plan
Sponsor
Senator Serafini
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0624 Montgomery County - Voting Methods MC 29-19 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1305 (SB0261/CH0224) Estates and Trusts - Administration of Estates - Waiver of Fees - Required Delegate Ivey 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Health and Government Operations
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0261 /CH0224 (HB1305) Estates and Trusts - Administration of Estates - Waiver of Fees - Required Senator Ferguson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 224
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2019 - 12:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0398 /CH0197 Code Revision - Estates and Trusts President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 197
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2019 - 12:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0735 State Employees and Teachers - Cash Balance Plan Senator Serafini 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 8:30 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/28/2019 - 8:30 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:34 PM