Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Religion -see also- Churches

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0409
Title
Election Law - Primary Elections and Early Voting - Dates
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0687
Title
Public Health - Religious Exemptions from Immunization Requirements - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1083 (SB0550)
Title
Child Custody - Legal Decision Making and Parenting Time
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1270
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Harambee House Community Outreach Center
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0550 (HB1083)
Title
Child Custody - Legal Decision Making and Parenting Time
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0578
Title
Higher Education - Sexual Assaults - Mandatory Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0409 Election Law - Primary Elections and Early Voting - Dates Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Ways and Means
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0687 Public Health - Religious Exemptions from Immunization Requirements - Repeal Delegate Barnes, B. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
HB1083 (SB0550) Child Custody - Legal Decision Making and Parenting Time Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1270 Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Harambee House Community Outreach Center Delegate Beidle 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/14/2015 - 9:00 AM
SB0550 (HB1083) Child Custody - Legal Decision Making and Parenting Time Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0578 Higher Education - Sexual Assaults - Mandatory Reporting Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:42 PM