Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Religion -see also- Churches

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0016
Title
Marriage - Religious Organizations - Protections
Sponsor
Delegate Metzgar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0066 /CH0088
Title
Residential Child Care Capital Grant Program - Repeal
Sponsor
Chair, Appropriations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0729
Title
Taxation - Prohibition on Exemptions and Credits for Organizations Having Known Ties to Terrorism (Homegrown Terrorism Prevention Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Vogt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0764 (SB0521)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Charitable Gaming
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0878 /CH0162 (SB0128/CH0161)
Title
Maryland Higher Education Commission - Religious Educational Institutions - Authority to Operate
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0955 (SB0267)
Title
Public Schools - Voluntary Nonsectarian Prayer at School-Sponsored Student Events
Sponsor
Delegate Metzgar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1050
Title
Income Tax Credit - Holocaust Survivors
Sponsor
Delegate Platt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1232 (SB0978)
Title
Child Custody - Legal Decision Making and Parenting Time
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1266 (SB0881)
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket Transfers, Sales, and Resales
Sponsor
Delegate Frick
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1379 (SB0813)
Title
Child Custody and Visitation - Deployed Parents
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1444 /CH0652
Title
Mary Byrd Wyman Memorial Association of Baltimore City
Sponsor
Delegate Aumann
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1465
Title
Foster Care - Standards for Foster Parents
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1625 (SB1152)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Torah School of Greater Washington
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0128 /CH0161 (HB0878/CH0162)
Title
Maryland Higher Education Commission - Religious Educational Institutions - Authority to Operate
Sponsor
Senator Serafini
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0267 (HB0955)
Title
Public Schools - Voluntary Nonsectarian Prayer at School-Sponsored Student Events
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0521 (HB0764)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Charitable Gaming
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0813 (HB1379)
Title
Child Custody and Visitation - Deployed Parents
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0881 (HB1266)
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket Transfers, Sales, and Resales
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0978 (HB1232)
Title
Child Custody - Legal Decision Making and Parenting Time
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1152 (HB1625)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Torah School of Greater Washington
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1155
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Talmudical Academy Gymnasium
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0016 Marriage - Religious Organizations - Protections Delegate Metzgar 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB0066 /CH0088 Residential Child Care Capital Grant Program - Repeal Chair, Appropriations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 88
Appropriations
1/26/2016 - 3:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0729 Taxation - Prohibition on Exemptions and Credits for Organizations Having Known Ties to Terrorism (Homegrown Terrorism Prevention Act) Delegate Vogt 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Ways and Means
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0764 (SB0521) Anne Arundel County - Charitable Gaming Anne Arundel County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Ways and Means
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB0878 /CH0162 (SB0128/CH0161) Maryland Higher Education Commission - Religious Educational Institutions - Authority to Operate Delegate Parrott 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 162
Appropriations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0955 (SB0267) Public Schools - Voluntary Nonsectarian Prayer at School-Sponsored Student Events Delegate Metzgar 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/26/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1050 Income Tax Credit - Holocaust Survivors Delegate Platt 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1232 (SB0978) Child Custody - Legal Decision Making and Parenting Time Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1266 (SB0881) Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket Transfers, Sales, and Resales Delegate Frick 2 2 In the House - Referred to interim study by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1379 (SB0813) Child Custody and Visitation - Deployed Parents Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1444 /CH0652 Mary Byrd Wyman Memorial Association of Baltimore City Delegate Aumann 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 652
Economic Matters
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1465 Foster Care - Standards for Foster Parents Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1625 (SB1152) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Torah School of Greater Washington Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/14/2016 - 9:00 AM
SB0128 /CH0161 (HB0878/CH0162) Maryland Higher Education Commission - Religious Educational Institutions - Authority to Operate Senator Serafini 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 161
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/27/2016 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0267 (HB0955) Public Schools - Voluntary Nonsectarian Prayer at School-Sponsored Student Events Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/03/2016 - 2:00 PM
SB0521 (HB0764) Anne Arundel County - Charitable Gaming Anne Arundel County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0813 (HB1379) Child Custody and Visitation - Deployed Parents Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0881 (HB1266) Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket Transfers, Sales, and Resales Senator Jennings 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0978 (HB1232) Child Custody - Legal Decision Making and Parenting Time Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1152 (HB1625) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Torah School of Greater Washington Senator Manno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 10:30 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/14/2016 - 10:30 AM
SB1155 Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Talmudical Academy Gymnasium Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 10:30 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/14/2016 - 10:30 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:47 PM