Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Religion -see also- Churches

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0314 (SB0388)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Caroline County - Benedictine School
Sponsor
Delegate Ghrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0355 /CH0561
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Discrimination - Prohibited MC/PG 102-17
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0372
Title
Public Schools - Voluntary Nonsectarian Prayer at School-Sponsored Student Events
Sponsor
Delegate Metzgar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0577
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Highland Park Christian Academy
Sponsor
Delegate Howard, C.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0825 (SB0351)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Melvin J. Berman Hebrew Academy
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0890 (SB1189)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Ner Israel Rabbinical College
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0985 (SB1028)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Harambee House Community Outreach Center
Sponsor
Delegate Busch
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1137 (SB1159)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Get Involved Community Center
Sponsor
Delegate Ali
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1249
Title
Corporations and Associations - Domestications - Authorization
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1530
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Torah School of Greater Washington
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1590
Title
State Government - Creation and Maintenance of Religious Registry - Prohibitions and Immunity for Refusal to Provide Information
Sponsor
Delegate Frick
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1661 (SB1191/CH0732)
Title
Schools and Child Care Centers - State Grant Program - Security Upgrades for Facilities at Risk of Hate Crimes or Attacks
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0351 (HB0825)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Melvin J. Berman Hebrew Academy
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0388 (HB0314)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Caroline County - Benedictine School
Sponsor
Caroline County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1028 (HB0985)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Harambee House Community Outreach Center
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1159 (HB1137)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Get Involved Community Center
Sponsor
Senator Oaks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1188
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Bais Yaakov Middle School
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1189 (HB0890)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Ner Israel Rabbinical College
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1191 /CH0732 (HB1661)
Title
Schools and Child Care Centers - State Grant Program - Security Upgrades for Facilities at Risk of Hate Crimes or Attacks
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0314 (SB0388) Creation of a State Debt - Caroline County - Benedictine School Delegate Ghrist 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/11/2017 - 4:00 PM
HB0355 /CH0561 Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Discrimination - Prohibited MC/PG 102-17 Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 561
Health and Government Operations
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0372 Public Schools - Voluntary Nonsectarian Prayer at School-Sponsored Student Events Delegate Metzgar 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0577 Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Highland Park Christian Academy Delegate Howard, C. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/11/2017 - 4:00 PM
HB0825 (SB0351) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Melvin J. Berman Hebrew Academy Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/13/2017 - 11:30 AM
HB0890 (SB1189) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Ner Israel Rabbinical College Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/13/2017 - 11:30 AM
HB0985 (SB1028) Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Harambee House Community Outreach Center Delegate Busch 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/11/2017 - 11:00 AM
HB1137 (SB1159) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Get Involved Community Center Delegate Ali 2 2 In the House - Hearing canceled
Appropriations
HB1249 Corporations and Associations - Domestications - Authorization Delegate Sydnor 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB1530 Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Torah School of Greater Washington Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/13/2017 - 11:30 AM
HB1590 State Government - Creation and Maintenance of Religious Registry - Prohibitions and Immunity for Refusal to Provide Information Delegate Frick 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1661 (SB1191/CH0732) Schools and Child Care Centers - State Grant Program - Security Upgrades for Facilities at Risk of Hate Crimes or Attacks Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 Veto sustained (0-140)
Ways and Means
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0351 (HB0825) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Melvin J. Berman Hebrew Academy Senator Manno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 10:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/13/2017 - 10:00 AM
SB0388 (HB0314) Creation of a State Debt - Caroline County - Benedictine School Caroline County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2017 - 2:00 PM
SB1028 (HB0985) Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Harambee House Community Outreach Center Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2017 - 2:00 PM
SB1159 (HB1137) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Get Involved Community Center Senator Oaks 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 3:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2017 - 3:00 PM
SB1188 Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Bais Yaakov Middle School Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 10:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/13/2017 - 10:00 AM
SB1189 (HB0890) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Ner Israel Rabbinical College Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 10:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/13/2017 - 10:00 AM
SB1191 /CH0732 (HB1661) Schools and Child Care Centers - State Grant Program - Security Upgrades for Facilities at Risk of Hate Crimes or Attacks Senator Manno 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 732
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:50 PM