Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Religion -see also- Churches

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0699 (SB0460)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Bender Jewish Community Center of Greater Washington
Sponsor
Delegate Frick
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0908 /CH0715 (SB0271/CH0716)
Title
Health Insurance - Coverage of Fertility Preservation Procedures for Iatrogenic Infertility
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1009 /CH0090
Title
Workgroup on the Licensing of Food Service Facilities
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1024 /CH0510 (SB0986/CH0511)
Title
State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Contraceptive Drugs and Devices and Male Sterilization
Sponsor
Delegate Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1306 (SB0613)
Title
Baltimore County Board of Education - Voluntary Nonsectarian Prayer at School-Sponsored Student Events - Referendum
Sponsor
Delegate Metzgar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1689 (SB0685)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Melvin J. Berman Hebrew Academy
Sponsor
Delegate Morales
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0026
Title
State Agency Loan Program and Jane E. Lawton Conservation Loan Program - Merger
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0271 /CH0716 (HB0908/CH0715)
Title
Health Insurance - Coverage of Fertility Preservation Procedures for Iatrogenic Infertility
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0460 (HB0699)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Bender Jewish Community Center of Greater Washington
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0525
Title
Public Institutions of Higher Education – Discriminatory Harassment
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0613 (HB1306)
Title
Baltimore County Board of Education - Voluntary Nonsectarian Prayer at School-Sponsored Student Events - Referendum
Sponsor
Senator Robinson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0685 (HB1689)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Melvin J. Berman Hebrew Academy
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0699 (SB0460) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Bender Jewish Community Center of Greater Washington Delegate Frick 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/12/2018 - 10:30 AM
HB0908 /CH0715 (SB0271/CH0716) Health Insurance - Coverage of Fertility Preservation Procedures for Iatrogenic Infertility Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 715
Health and Government Operations
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1009 /CH0090 Workgroup on the Licensing of Food Service Facilities Delegate Krebs 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 90
Health and Government Operations
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1024 /CH0510 (SB0986/CH0511) State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Contraceptive Drugs and Devices and Male Sterilization Delegate Hettleman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 510
Appropriations
2/23/2018 - 2:00 PM
Finance
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1306 (SB0613) Baltimore County Board of Education - Voluntary Nonsectarian Prayer at School-Sponsored Student Events - Referendum Delegate Metzgar 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1689 (SB0685) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Melvin J. Berman Hebrew Academy Delegate Morales 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/12/2018 - 10:30 AM
SB0026 State Agency Loan Program and Jane E. Lawton Conservation Loan Program - Merger Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Finance
1/11/2018 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
3/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0271 /CH0716 (HB0908/CH0715) Health Insurance - Coverage of Fertility Preservation Procedures for Iatrogenic Infertility Senator Mathias 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 716
Finance
2/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0460 (HB0699) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Bender Jewish Community Center of Greater Washington Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 9:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/12/2018 - 9:00 AM
SB0525 Public Institutions of Higher Education – Discriminatory Harassment Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0613 (HB1306) Baltimore County Board of Education - Voluntary Nonsectarian Prayer at School-Sponsored Student Events - Referendum Senator Robinson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0685 (HB1689) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Melvin J. Berman Hebrew Academy Senator Manno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 9:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/12/2018 - 9:00 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:54 PM