Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Reproductive Matters -see also- Abortion; Birth Control

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0613 /CH0820 (SB0363/CH0821)
Title
Pharmacists - Contraceptives - Prescribing and Dispensing
Sponsor
Delegate Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0876 (SB0918)
Title
Health Insurance - Coverage of Fertility Preservation Procedures for Iatrogenic Infertility
Sponsor
Delegate McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1083 /CH0028 (SB1081/CH0810)
Title
Health - Family Planning Services - Continuity of Care
Sponsor
Delegate Pendergrass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1557 (SB1156)
Title
Health Insurance - Coverage for Male Sterilization - High-Deductible Health Plans
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0096
Title
Health Insurance - Coverage for Fertility Awareness-Based Methods
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0363 /CH0821 (HB0613/CH0820)
Title
Pharmacists - Contraceptives - Prescribing and Dispensing
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0918 (HB0876)
Title
Health Insurance - Coverage of Fertility Preservation Procedures for Iatrogenic Infertility
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1081 /CH0810 (HB1083/CH0028)
Title
Health - Family Planning Services - Continuity of Care
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1156 (HB1557)
Title
Health Insurance - Coverage for Male Sterilization - High-Deductible Health Plans
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0613 /CH0820 (SB0363/CH0821) Pharmacists - Contraceptives - Prescribing and Dispensing Delegate Hettleman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 820
Health and Government Operations
2/10/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0876 (SB0918) Health Insurance - Coverage of Fertility Preservation Procedures for Iatrogenic Infertility Delegate McCray 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1083 /CH0028 (SB1081/CH0810) Health - Family Planning Services - Continuity of Care Delegate Pendergrass 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 28
Health and Government Operations
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1557 (SB1156) Health Insurance - Coverage for Male Sterilization - High-Deductible Health Plans Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0096 Health Insurance - Coverage for Fertility Awareness-Based Methods Senator Reilly 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0363 /CH0821 (HB0613/CH0820) Pharmacists - Contraceptives - Prescribing and Dispensing Senator Conway 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 821
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0918 (HB0876) Health Insurance - Coverage of Fertility Preservation Procedures for Iatrogenic Infertility Senator Mathias 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1081 /CH0810 (HB1083/CH0028) Health - Family Planning Services - Continuity of Care Senator Madaleno 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 810
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB1156 (HB1557) Health Insurance - Coverage for Male Sterilization - High-Deductible Health Plans Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:50 PM