Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Reproductive Matters -see also- Abortion; Birth Control

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0249 /CH0437 (SB0033/CH0438)
Title
Health Insurance - Coverage for Fertility Awareness-Based Methods
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0780 (SB0744)
Title
Insurance - Contraceptive Coverage - Consumer Information
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0908 /CH0715 (SB0271/CH0716)
Title
Health Insurance - Coverage of Fertility Preservation Procedures for Iatrogenic Infertility
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1335
Title
Public Health - Abortions Sought by Minors - Parent or Guardian Consent
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1518 /CH0308
Title
Public Health - Maternal Mortality Review Program - Report and Stakeholder Meetings
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1650
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Maryland Teenage Pregnancy Prevention Grant Program
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1727
Title
Health Insurance - Infertility Treatment and In Vitro Fertilization - Coverage
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0010
Title
Decreasing Surgical Births
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0033 /CH0438 (HB0249/CH0437)
Title
Health Insurance - Coverage for Fertility Awareness-Based Methods
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0137 /CH0065 (HB0135/CH0064)
Title
Health Insurance - Coverage for Male Sterilization - High-Deductible Health Plans
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0271 /CH0716 (HB0908/CH0715)
Title
Health Insurance - Coverage of Fertility Preservation Procedures for Iatrogenic Infertility
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0444 /CH0708
Title
Task Force on the Social Determinants of Health in Baltimore City
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0629 /CH0828 (HB0787/CH0827)
Title
Correctional Facilities - Pregnant Inmates - Medical Care
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0686
Title
Health Insurance - Coverage for Over-the-Counter Contraceptive Drugs and Devices
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0744 (HB0780)
Title
Insurance – Contraceptive Coverage – Consumer Information
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0774 /CH0465 (HB0994/CH0464)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Family Planning Services
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0249 /CH0437 (SB0033/CH0438) Health Insurance - Coverage for Fertility Awareness-Based Methods Delegate Kipke 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 437
Health and Government Operations
2/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0780 (SB0744) Insurance - Contraceptive Coverage - Consumer Information Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0908 /CH0715 (SB0271/CH0716) Health Insurance - Coverage of Fertility Preservation Procedures for Iatrogenic Infertility Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 715
Health and Government Operations
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1335 Public Health - Abortions Sought by Minors - Parent or Guardian Consent Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/09/2018 - 2:00 PM
HB1518 /CH0308 Public Health - Maternal Mortality Review Program - Report and Stakeholder Meetings Delegate Wilkins 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 308
Health and Government Operations
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1650 Maryland Department of Health - Maryland Teenage Pregnancy Prevention Grant Program Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/09/2018 - 2:00 PM
HB1727 Health Insurance - Infertility Treatment and In Vitro Fertilization - Coverage Delegate Miller, A. 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HJ0010 Decreasing Surgical Births Delegate Young, K. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/05/2018 - 3:00 PM
SB0033 /CH0438 (HB0249/CH0437) Health Insurance - Coverage for Fertility Awareness-Based Methods Senator Reilly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 438
Finance
1/31/2018 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0137 /CH0065 (HB0135/CH0064) Health Insurance - Coverage for Male Sterilization - High-Deductible Health Plans Senator Reilly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 65
Finance
1/31/2018 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0271 /CH0716 (HB0908/CH0715) Health Insurance - Coverage of Fertility Preservation Procedures for Iatrogenic Infertility Senator Mathias 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 716
Finance
2/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0444 /CH0708 Task Force on the Social Determinants of Health in Baltimore City Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 708
Finance
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0629 /CH0828 (HB0787/CH0827) Correctional Facilities - Pregnant Inmates - Medical Care Senator Kelley 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 828
Judicial Proceedings
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0686 Health Insurance - Coverage for Over-the-Counter Contraceptive Drugs and Devices Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0744 (HB0780) Insurance – Contraceptive Coverage – Consumer Information Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0774 /CH0465 (HB0994/CH0464) Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Family Planning Services Senator Benson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 465
Finance
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:54 PM