Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Reproductive Matters -see also- Abortion; Birth Control

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0519 /CH0438 (SB0697/CH0437)
Title
Family Law - Parentage and Adoption
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0630 (SB0420)
Title
Health - Abortions - Reporting Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Wivell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0975 (SB0907)
Title
Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1031
Title
Declaration of Rights - Right of Bodily Integrity and Privacy
Sponsor
Delegate Busch
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1272 /CH0733 (SB0904/CH0734)
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Family Planning Program - Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Pendergrass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0420 (HB0630)
Title
Health - Abortions - Reporting Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0697 /CH0437 (HB0519/CH0438)
Title
Family Law - Parentage and Adoption
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0904 /CH0734 (HB1272/CH0733)
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Family Planning Program - Funding
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0907 (HB0975)
Title
Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act
Sponsor
Senator Serafini
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0519 /CH0438 (SB0697/CH0437) Family Law - Parentage and Adoption Delegate Dumais 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 438
Judiciary
2/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Judicial Proceedings
HB0630 (SB0420) Health - Abortions - Reporting Requirements Delegate Wivell 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/08/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0975 (SB0907) Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/08/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1031 Declaration of Rights - Right of Bodily Integrity and Privacy Delegate Busch 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
HB1272 /CH0733 (SB0904/CH0734) Maryland Department of Health - Family Planning Program - Funding Delegate Pendergrass 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 733
Health and Government Operations
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0420 (HB0630) Health - Abortions - Reporting Requirements Senator Carozza 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/15/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0697 /CH0437 (HB0519/CH0438) Family Law - Parentage and Adoption Senator Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 437
Judicial Proceedings
3/06/2019 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0904 /CH0734 (HB1272/CH0733) Maryland Department of Health - Family Planning Program - Funding Senator Kelley 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 734
Finance
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0907 (HB0975) Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act Senator Serafini 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:34 PM