Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Reproductive Matters -see also- Abortion; Birth Control

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0009
Title
Maryland Horse Industry Board - Breeding Stables and Horse Establishments - Definitions
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0053
Title
Public Health - Contraceptive Devices - Minors
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0208
Title
Public Schools - Provision of Menstrual Hygiene Products
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0781 /CH0324 (SB0988/CH0325)
Title
Health Insurance - In Vitro Fertilization - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1298 (SB0791)
Title
County Boards of Education - Pregnant and Parenting Students - Policies and Reports
Sponsor
Delegate Cain
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1592 (SB1044)
Title
State Government - Prevention of Genocide and Crimes Against Humanity and the Commission on Genocide Prevention
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0110
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Doulas
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0791 (HB1298)
Title
County Boards of Education - Pregnant and Parenting Students - Policies and Reports
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0988 /CH0325 (HB0781/CH0324)
Title
Health Insurance - In Vitro Fertilization - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1044 (HB1592)
Title
State Government - Prevention of Genocide and Crimes Against Humanity and the Commission on Genocide Prevention
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0009 Maryland Horse Industry Board - Breeding Stables and Horse Establishments - Definitions Delegate Guyton 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB0053 Public Health - Contraceptive Devices - Minors Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/13/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0208 Public Schools - Provision of Menstrual Hygiene Products Delegate Reznik 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
1/30/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0781 /CH0324 (SB0988/CH0325) Health Insurance - In Vitro Fertilization - Revisions Delegate Kelly 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 324
Health and Government Operations
2/13/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1298 (SB0791) County Boards of Education - Pregnant and Parenting Students - Policies and Reports Delegate Cain 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1592 (SB1044) State Government - Prevention of Genocide and Crimes Against Humanity and the Commission on Genocide Prevention Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0110 Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Doulas Senator Ellis 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Finance
1/30/2020 - 2:00 PM
SB0791 (HB1298) County Boards of Education - Pregnant and Parenting Students - Policies and Reports Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0988 /CH0325 (HB0781/CH0324) Health Insurance - In Vitro Fertilization - Revisions Senator Hettleman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 325
Finance
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB1044 (HB1592) State Government - Prevention of Genocide and Crimes Against Humanity and the Commission on Genocide Prevention Senator Hester 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/13/2020 2:19 PM