Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Rescue Squads -see also- Ambulances; Emergency Medical Serv

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0778 /CH0332 (SB0899/CH0331)
Title
Local Government - Fire, Rescue, and Ambulance Funds - Distribution
Sponsor
Delegate Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0889 (SB0621/CH0066)
Title
Vehicles Laws - Emergency Vehicles - Motorcades and Escorts
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0894
Title
Firearms - Dealer's License and Handgun Permit Application Fees
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1004 (SB0774/CH0546)
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Maryland Civil Air Patrol
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1007 (SB0744)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Bohrer Park Miniature Golf Course
Sponsor
Delegate Barve
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1248
Title
Workers' Compensation - Average Weekly Wage - Volunteer Company Member
Sponsor
Delegate Jameson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1256
Title
Workers' Compensation - Occupational Disease - Post-Traumatic Stress Disorder
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1304 (SB0661)
Title
Privileged Communications - Critical Incident Stress Management and Peer Support
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1314 (SB0681)
Title
Workers' Compensation - Medical Presumptions - Statute of Limitations on Claims
Sponsor
Delegate Jameson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0587 /CH0503
Title
Higher Education - Charles W. Riley Firefighter and Ambulance and Rescue Squad Member Scholarship
Sponsor
Senator Garagiola
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0621 /CH0066 (HB0889)
Title
Vehicles Laws - Emergency Vehicles - Motorcades and Escorts
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0661 (HB1304)
Title
Privileged Communications - Critical Incident Stress Management and Peer Support
Sponsor
Senator Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0681 (HB1314)
Title
Workers' Compensation - Medical Presumptions - Statute of Limitations on Claims
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0774 /CH0546 (HB1004)
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Maryland Civil Air Patrol
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0899 /CH0331 (HB0778/CH0332)
Title
Local Government - Fire, Rescue, and Ambulance Funds - Distribution
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1054 (HB1515/CH0429)
Title
Transportation Infrastructure Investment Act of 2013
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1055
Title
State Aid for Critical Services - County Maintenance of Effort Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0778 /CH0332 (SB0899/CH0331) Local Government - Fire, Rescue, and Ambulance Funds - Distribution Delegate Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 332
Health and Government Operations
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0889 (SB0621/CH0066) Vehicles Laws - Emergency Vehicles - Motorcades and Escorts Delegate Malone 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Environmental Matters
3/01/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0894 Firearms - Dealer's License and Handgun Permit Application Fees Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1004 (SB0774/CH0546) Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Maryland Civil Air Patrol Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Ways and Means
3/08/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1007 (SB0744) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Bohrer Park Miniature Golf Course Delegate Barve 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/09/2013 - 11:00 AM
HB1248 Workers' Compensation - Average Weekly Wage - Volunteer Company Member Delegate Jameson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
3/01/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1256 Workers' Compensation - Occupational Disease - Post-Traumatic Stress Disorder Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB1304 (SB0661) Privileged Communications - Critical Incident Stress Management and Peer Support Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1314 (SB0681) Workers' Compensation - Medical Presumptions - Statute of Limitations on Claims Delegate Jameson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
3/01/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0587 /CH0503 Higher Education - Charles W. Riley Firefighter and Ambulance and Rescue Squad Member Scholarship Senator Garagiola 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 503
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0621 /CH0066 (HB0889) Vehicles Laws - Emergency Vehicles - Motorcades and Escorts Senator Raskin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 66
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/29/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0661 (HB1304) Privileged Communications - Critical Incident Stress Management and Peer Support Senator Jacobs 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0681 (HB1314) Workers' Compensation - Medical Presumptions - Statute of Limitations on Claims Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0774 /CH0546 (HB1004) Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Maryland Civil Air Patrol Senator Mathias 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 546
Budget and Taxation
3/13/2013 - 1:15 PM
Ways and Means
4/04/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0899 /CH0331 (HB0778/CH0332) Local Government - Fire, Rescue, and Ambulance Funds - Distribution Senator Mathias 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 331
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/04/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB1054 (HB1515/CH0429) Transportation Infrastructure Investment Act of 2013 President 3 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SB1055 State Aid for Critical Services - County Maintenance of Effort Requirements Senator Manno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:41 PM