Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Rescue Squads -see also- Ambulances; Emergency Medical Serv

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0329 /CH0097 (SB0615)
Title
Frederick County - Gaming Permits
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0365 /CH0225 (SB0254)
Title
Public Safety - Fire, Rescue, and Ambulance Funds - Distribution
Sponsor
Delegate Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0378 (SB0440/CH0166)
Title
Somerset County - Service Award Program for Emergency Medical Services and Fire and Rescue Personnel
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0438
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Overtime Compensation Earned by Certain Individuals
Sponsor
Delegate Summers
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1056
Title
Calvert County - Length of Service Award - Fire Fighters, Rescue Squad Members, and Rescue Dive Team Members - Increase Authorized
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1183 (SB0797)
Title
Criminal Law - Assault - First Responders
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1228 /CH0372 (SB1070/CH0371)
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Volunteer Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Medical Services Members
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1353
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Gift Cards Purchased for Emergency Personnel
Sponsor
Delegate Glass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1461
Title
Hometown Heroes - Income Tax Subtraction Modification - Retirement Income of Law Enforcement, Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Services Personnel
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1531 /CH0255
Title
St. Mary's County Metropolitan Commission - Water and Sewer Service Charges - Volunteer Fire Departments and Rescue Squads - Exemption
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0196
Title
Workers' Compensation - Volunteer Canteen and Rehabilitation Personnel
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0254 (HB0365/CH0225)
Title
Public Safety - Fire, Rescue, and Ambulance Funds - Distribution
Sponsor
Senator Glassman
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0340 /CH0292
Title
Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Unlicensed Establishments - Prohibitions
Sponsor
Calvert County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0440 /CH0166 (HB0378)
Title
Somerset County - Service Award Program for Emergency Medical Services and Fire and Rescue Personnel
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0461
Title
Privileged Communications - Critical Incident Stress Management Services
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0496 /CH0513
Title
Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Organizational Licenses
Sponsor
Calvert County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0615 (HB0329/CH0097)
Title
Frederick County - Gaming Permits
Sponsor
Senator Brinkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0797 (HB1183)
Title
Criminal Law - Assault - First Responders
Sponsor
Senator Montgomery
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1070 /CH0371 (HB1228/CH0372)
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Volunteer Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Medical Services Members
Sponsor
Senator DeGrange
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1099 /CH0374
Title
Workers' Compensation - Occupational Disease Presumptions - Paid Rescue Squad Members and Paid Advanced Life Support Unit Members
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0329 /CH0097 (SB0615) Frederick County - Gaming Permits Frederick County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 97
Ways and Means
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0365 /CH0225 (SB0254) Public Safety - Fire, Rescue, and Ambulance Funds - Distribution Delegate Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 225
Health and Government Operations
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/19/2014 - 1:45 PM
HB0378 (SB0440/CH0166) Somerset County - Service Award Program for Emergency Medical Services and Fire and Rescue Personnel Delegate Otto 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Health and Government Operations
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0438 Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Overtime Compensation Earned by Certain Individuals Delegate Summers 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1056 Calvert County - Length of Service Award - Fire Fighters, Rescue Squad Members, and Rescue Dive Team Members - Increase Authorized Calvert County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/07/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1183 (SB0797) Criminal Law - Assault - First Responders Delegate Malone 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1228 /CH0372 (SB1070/CH0371) Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Volunteer Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Medical Services Members Delegate Luedtke 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 372
Ways and Means
3/07/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1353 Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Gift Cards Purchased for Emergency Personnel Delegate Glass 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1461 Hometown Heroes - Income Tax Subtraction Modification - Retirement Income of Law Enforcement, Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Services Personnel Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1531 /CH0255 St. Mary's County Metropolitan Commission - Water and Sewer Service Charges - Volunteer Fire Departments and Rescue Squads - Exemption St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 255
Environmental Matters
3/14/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0196 Workers' Compensation - Volunteer Canteen and Rehabilitation Personnel Senator Jennings 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0254 (HB0365/CH0225) Public Safety - Fire, Rescue, and Ambulance Funds - Distribution Senator Glassman 6 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Budget and Taxation
1/29/2014 - 1:45 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0340 /CH0292 Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Unlicensed Establishments - Prohibitions Calvert County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 292
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0440 /CH0166 (HB0378) Somerset County - Service Award Program for Emergency Medical Services and Fire and Rescue Personnel Senator Mathias 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 166
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0461 Privileged Communications - Critical Incident Stress Management Services Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0496 /CH0513 Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Organizational Licenses Calvert County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 513
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0615 (HB0329/CH0097) Frederick County - Gaming Permits Senator Brinkley 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Budget and Taxation
2/26/2014 - 1:30 PM
Ways and Means
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0797 (HB1183) Criminal Law - Assault - First Responders Senator Montgomery 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB1070 /CH0371 (HB1228/CH0372) Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Volunteer Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Medical Services Members Senator DeGrange 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 371
Budget and Taxation
3/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/02/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB1099 /CH0374 Workers' Compensation - Occupational Disease Presumptions - Paid Rescue Squad Members and Paid Advanced Life Support Unit Members Senator Manno 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 374
Finance
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
4/03/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:42 PM