Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Restaurants

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0229 (SB0186)
Title
Environment - Polystyrene Food Service Products and Polystyrene Loose Fill Packaging - Prohibition on Sale
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0522 /CH0035 (SB0427/CH0034)
Title
Maryland Institute for Emergency Medical Services Systems - Automated External Defibrillators - Study (The Joe Sheya Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0646 /CH0074 (SB0453/CH0073)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Restaurants - Average Daily Receipts
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0929 /CH0144
Title
Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses and Sunday Sales
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1043
Title
Vehicle Laws - Smoking Marijuana in Vehicles - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1348 /CH0600 (SB1035)
Title
Baltimore City - 46th District Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2017
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1450 (SB1039/CH0430)
Title
Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Hotel and Motel Licenses
Sponsor
Delegate Wivell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0186 (HB0229)
Title
Environment - Polystyrene Food Service Products and Polystyrene Loose Fill Packaging - Prohibition on Sale
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0427 /CH0034 (HB0522/CH0035)
Title
Maryland Institute for Emergency Medical Services Systems - Automated External Defibrillators - Study (The Joe Sheya Act)
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0445
Title
Criminal Law - Smoking Marijuana in a Public Place - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0453 /CH0073 (HB0646/CH0074)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Restaurants - Average Daily Receipts
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0965
Title
Public Health - Auto-Injectable Epinephrine - Certification for Emergency Administration
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0995 (HB1266)
Title
Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class BLX License - Movie Theaters
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1035 (HB1348/CH0600)
Title
Baltimore City - 46th District Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2017
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1039 /CH0430 (HB1450)
Title
Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Hotel and Motel Licenses
Sponsor
Washington County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1073
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - Utilities for Operation of Restaurants
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1088 /CH0099 (HB1601)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Beer, Wine, and Liquor Licenses
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1186
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Cross Street Market
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0229 (SB0186) Environment - Polystyrene Food Service Products and Polystyrene Loose Fill Packaging - Prohibition on Sale Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB0522 /CH0035 (SB0427/CH0034) Maryland Institute for Emergency Medical Services Systems - Automated External Defibrillators - Study (The Joe Sheya Act) Delegate Barron 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 35
Health and Government Operations
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0646 /CH0074 (SB0453/CH0073) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Restaurants - Average Daily Receipts Frederick County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 74
Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0929 /CH0144 Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses and Sunday Sales Delegate Beitzel 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 144
Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1043 Vehicle Laws - Smoking Marijuana in Vehicles - Prohibition Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1348 /CH0600 (SB1035) Baltimore City - 46th District Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2017 Delegate Clippinger 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 600
Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1450 (SB1039/CH0430) Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Hotel and Motel Licenses Delegate Wivell 2 2 Veto sustained (0-140)
Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0186 (HB0229) Environment - Polystyrene Food Service Products and Polystyrene Loose Fill Packaging - Prohibition on Sale Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/31/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0427 /CH0034 (HB0522/CH0035) Maryland Institute for Emergency Medical Services Systems - Automated External Defibrillators - Study (The Joe Sheya Act) Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 34
Finance
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0445 Criminal Law - Smoking Marijuana in a Public Place - Prohibition Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0453 /CH0073 (HB0646/CH0074) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Restaurants - Average Daily Receipts Senator Young 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 73
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0965 Public Health - Auto-Injectable Epinephrine - Certification for Emergency Administration Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0995 (HB1266) Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class BLX License - Movie Theaters Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB1035 (HB1348/CH0600) Baltimore City - 46th District Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2017 Senator Ferguson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1039 /CH0430 (HB1450) Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Hotel and Motel Licenses Washington County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 430
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB1073 Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - Utilities for Operation of Restaurants Senator Waugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1088 /CH0099 (HB1601) Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Beer, Wine, and Liquor Licenses Senator Astle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 99
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1186 Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Cross Street Market Senator Ferguson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 3:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2017 - 3:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:50 PM