Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Restaurants

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0094 (SB0147)
Title
Creation of a State Debt – Anne Arundel County – Light House Bistro and Culinary Training Center
Sponsor
Delegate Busch
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0178 /CH0125
Title
Montgomery County Alcohol Modernization Act of 2018 MC 4-18
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0300 /CH0240 (SB0172/CH0239)
Title
Kent County – Alcoholic Beverages – Licenses
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0501 /CH0092 (SB0219/CH0091)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Seating Requirement for Class B Licenses
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0538 (SB0651)
Title
Environment - Expanded Polystyrene Food Service Products - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1003 /CH0225
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses Issued by Different Local Licensing Boards to Single License Holder - Authorized
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1053 /CH0139
Title
Howard County – Class 7 Micro–Brewery License and Multiple Class B and Class BLX Beer, Wine, and Liquor Licenses Ho. Co. 06–18
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1286 /CH0839 (SB0614/CH0840)
Title
State Center - Redevelopment - Requirements, Participation, and Process
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1395 /CH0762
Title
Baltimore County – Alcoholic Beverages – Authorization for Issuing an Additional Class B License – Repealed
Sponsor
Baltimore County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1473 /CH0527
Title
Public Health - Emergency Use Auto-Injectable Epinephrine Program at Institutions of Higher Education
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1575 /CH0765
Title
Baltimore County - Alcoholic Beverages - Multiple Class B Licenses
Sponsor
Baltimore County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0118 /CH0750 (HB0151)
Title
Baltimore City - Board of License Commissioners - New Licenses, Waivers, and License Transfers
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0147 (HB0094)
Title
Creation of a State Debt – Anne Arundel County – Light House Bistro and Culinary Training Center
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0172 /CH0239 (HB0300/CH0240)
Title
Kent County – Alcoholic Beverages – Licenses
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0219 /CH0091 (HB0501/CH0092)
Title
Frederick County – Alcoholic Beverages – Seating Requirement for Class B Licenses
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0614 /CH0840 (HB1286/CH0839)
Title
State Center - Redevelopment - Requirements, Participation, and Process
Sponsor
Senator Robinson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0651 (HB0538)
Title
Environment - Expanded Polystyrene Food Service Products - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1159
Title
Public Health - Emergency Use Auto-Injectable Epinephrine Program for Food Service Facilities
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0094 (SB0147) Creation of a State Debt – Anne Arundel County – Light House Bistro and Culinary Training Center Delegate Busch 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/10/2018 - 9:00 AM
HB0178 /CH0125 Montgomery County Alcohol Modernization Act of 2018 MC 4-18 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 125
Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0300 /CH0240 (SB0172/CH0239) Kent County – Alcoholic Beverages – Licenses Delegate Jacobs 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 240
Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0501 /CH0092 (SB0219/CH0091) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Seating Requirement for Class B Licenses Frederick County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 92
Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0538 (SB0651) Environment - Expanded Polystyrene Food Service Products - Prohibition Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB1003 /CH0225 Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses Issued by Different Local Licensing Boards to Single License Holder - Authorized Delegate Clippinger 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 225
Economic Matters
2/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1053 /CH0139 Howard County – Class 7 Micro–Brewery License and Multiple Class B and Class BLX Beer, Wine, and Liquor Licenses Ho. Co. 06–18 Howard County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 139
Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1286 /CH0839 (SB0614/CH0840) State Center - Redevelopment - Requirements, Participation, and Process Delegate Glenn 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 839
Health and Government Operations
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1395 /CH0762 Baltimore County – Alcoholic Beverages – Authorization for Issuing an Additional Class B License – Repealed Baltimore County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 762
Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1473 /CH0527 Public Health - Emergency Use Auto-Injectable Epinephrine Program at Institutions of Higher Education Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 527
Health and Government Operations
3/02/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1575 /CH0765 Baltimore County - Alcoholic Beverages - Multiple Class B Licenses Baltimore County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 765
Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/05/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0118 /CH0750 (HB0151) Baltimore City - Board of License Commissioners - New Licenses, Waivers, and License Transfers Senator Ferguson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 750
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0147 (HB0094) Creation of a State Debt – Anne Arundel County – Light House Bistro and Culinary Training Center Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 11:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 11:00 AM
SB0172 /CH0239 (HB0300/CH0240) Kent County – Alcoholic Beverages – Licenses Senator Hershey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 239
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0219 /CH0091 (HB0501/CH0092) Frederick County – Alcoholic Beverages – Seating Requirement for Class B Licenses Senator Young 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 91
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0614 /CH0840 (HB1286/CH0839) State Center - Redevelopment - Requirements, Participation, and Process Senator Robinson 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 840
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0651 (HB0538) Environment - Expanded Polystyrene Food Service Products - Prohibition Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB1159 Public Health - Emergency Use Auto-Injectable Epinephrine Program for Food Service Facilities Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:54 PM