Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Restaurants

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0109 /CH0579 (SB0285/CH0580)
Title
Environment – Expanded Polystyrene Food Service Products – Prohibitions
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0134
Title
Environment - Single-Use Plastic Straws - Use in Restaurants
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0166 /CH0010 (SB0280/CH0011)
Title
Labor and Employment – Payment of Wages – Minimum Wage (Fight for Fifteen)
Sponsor
Delegate Fennell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0189 /CH0587
Title
Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class BLX Licenses PG 304-19
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0312 /CH0629 (SB0276/CH0630)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Multiple Licenses Allowed
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0522 /CH0230
Title
Public Health - Food Establishments - Licensing
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0637 /CH0676 (SB0584/CH0677)
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0838 /CH0475 (SB0752)
Title
Food Supplement Program - Restaurant Meals Program
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1408
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Applications for Class B and Class BNR Licenses
Sponsor
Harford County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0276 /CH0630 (HB0312/CH0629)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Multiple Licenses Allowed
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0280 /CH0011 (HB0166/CH0010)
Title
Labor and Employment – Payment of Wages – Minimum Wage (Fight for Fifteen)
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0285 /CH0580 (HB0109/CH0579)
Title
Environment – Expanded Polystyrene Food Service Products – Prohibitions
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0584 /CH0677 (HB0637/CH0676)
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0674
Title
Baltimore County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Towson Row Development
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0752 (HB0838/CH0475)
Title
Food Supplement Program - Restaurant Meals Program
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0109 /CH0579 (SB0285/CH0580) Environment – Expanded Polystyrene Food Service Products – Prohibitions Delegate Lierman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 579
Environment and Transportation
2/06/2019 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0134 Environment - Single-Use Plastic Straws - Use in Restaurants Delegate Love 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
HB0166 /CH0010 (SB0280/CH0011) Labor and Employment – Payment of Wages – Minimum Wage (Fight for Fifteen) Delegate Fennell 2 2 Gubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 10
Economic Matters
2/08/2019 - 12:30 PM
Finance
HB0189 /CH0587 Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class BLX Licenses PG 304-19 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 587
Economic Matters
2/18/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0312 /CH0629 (SB0276/CH0630) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Multiple Licenses Allowed Frederick County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 629
Economic Matters
2/18/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0522 /CH0230 Public Health - Food Establishments - Licensing Delegate Krebs 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 230
Health and Government Operations
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0637 /CH0676 (SB0584/CH0677) Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses Delegate Clippinger 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 676
Economic Matters
2/18/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0838 /CH0475 (SB0752) Food Supplement Program - Restaurant Meals Program Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 475
Appropriations
2/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1408 Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Applications for Class B and Class BNR Licenses Harford County Delegation 4 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0276 /CH0630 (HB0312/CH0629) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Multiple Licenses Allowed Senator Young 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 630
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0280 /CH0011 (HB0166/CH0010) Labor and Employment – Payment of Wages – Minimum Wage (Fight for Fifteen) Senator McCray 2 2 Gubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 11
Finance
2/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0285 /CH0580 (HB0109/CH0579) Environment – Expanded Polystyrene Food Service Products – Prohibitions Senator Kagan 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 580
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Economic Matters
SB0584 /CH0677 (HB0637/CH0676) Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses Senator Ferguson 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 677
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0674 Baltimore County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Towson Row Development Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0752 (HB0838/CH0475) Food Supplement Program - Restaurant Meals Program Senator Lam 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Finance
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
4/02/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:34 PM