Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Restitution

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0210 (SB0268)
Title
Correctional Services - Baltimore City Detention Center - Transfer of Ownership
Sponsor
Delegate Cluster
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0549 /CH0093 (SB0561)
Title
Video Lottery Facility Payouts - Intercepts for Restitution Payments
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0630 /CH0444
Title
Mechanical Repair Contracts - Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Jameson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0633
Title
Cigarette Restitution Fund - Use of Funds - Compliance With Watershed Implementation Plans
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0713
Title
Natural Resources - Trade in Ivory and Rhinoceros Horn - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0732 (SB0770/CH0051)
Title
Insurance - Motor Vehicle Rental Companies - Limited Lines License to Sell Insurance
Sponsor
Delegate Vaughn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0737 /CH0337 (SB0288/CH0336)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Financial Crimes Against Vulnerable and Elder Adults - Petition to Freeze Assets
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0885 (SB0153)
Title
Corporations - Political Expenditures - Stockholder Approval
Sponsor
Delegate Platt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0153 (HB0885)
Title
Corporations - Political Expenditures - Stockholder Approval
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0268 (HB0210)
Title
Correctional Services - Baltimore City Detention Center - Transfer of Ownership
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0288 /CH0336 (HB0737/CH0337)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Financial Crimes Against Vulnerable and Elder Adults - Petition to Freeze Assets
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0305
Title
Crimes - Theft of Scrap Metal
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0561 (HB0549/CH0093)
Title
Video Lottery Facility Payouts - Intercepts for Restitution Payments
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0770 /CH0051 (HB0732)
Title
Insurance - Motor Vehicle Rental Companies - Limited Lines License to Sell Insurance
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0210 (SB0268) Correctional Services - Baltimore City Detention Center - Transfer of Ownership Delegate Cluster 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0549 /CH0093 (SB0561) Video Lottery Facility Payouts - Intercepts for Restitution Payments Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 93
Ways and Means
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2015 - 2:00 PM
HB0630 /CH0444 Mechanical Repair Contracts - Requirements Delegate Jameson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 444
Economic Matters
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0633 Cigarette Restitution Fund - Use of Funds - Compliance With Watershed Implementation Plans Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB0713 Natural Resources - Trade in Ivory and Rhinoceros Horn - Prohibition Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/04/2015 - 1:15 PM
HB0732 (SB0770/CH0051) Insurance - Motor Vehicle Rental Companies - Limited Lines License to Sell Insurance Delegate Vaughn 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Economic Matters
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0737 /CH0337 (SB0288/CH0336) Criminal Procedure - Financial Crimes Against Vulnerable and Elder Adults - Petition to Freeze Assets Delegate Wilson, B. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 337
Judiciary
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0885 (SB0153) Corporations - Political Expenditures - Stockholder Approval Delegate Platt 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0153 (HB0885) Corporations - Political Expenditures - Stockholder Approval Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0268 (HB0210) Correctional Services - Baltimore City Detention Center - Transfer of Ownership Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Zirkin)
Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0288 /CH0336 (HB0737/CH0337) Criminal Procedure - Financial Crimes Against Vulnerable and Elder Adults - Petition to Freeze Assets Senator Lee 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 336
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0305 Crimes - Theft of Scrap Metal Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0561 (HB0549/CH0093) Video Lottery Facility Payouts - Intercepts for Restitution Payments Senator Peters 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0770 /CH0051 (HB0732) Insurance - Motor Vehicle Rental Companies - Limited Lines License to Sell Insurance Senator Astle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 51
Finance
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:42 PM