Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Restitution

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0541 (SB0474)
Title
Cigarette Restitution Fund - Establishment of Behavioral Health Treatment Account and Funding for Substance Use Treatment Services
Sponsor
Delegate Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0625 (SB0080)
Title
Criminal Law - Animal Abuse - Penalties and Restitution
Sponsor
Delegate Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0895 (SB0655)
Title
Horse Racing - Prizes - Intercepts for Restitution and Child Support Payments
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1428
Title
Criminal Procedure - Victim Services Unit - Victims' Compensation
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0080 (HB0625)
Title
Criminal Law - Animal Abuse - Penalties and Restitution
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0474 (HB0541)
Title
Cigarette Restitution Fund - Establishment of Behavioral Health Treatment Account and Funding for Substance Use Treatment Services
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0655 (HB0895)
Title
Horse Racing - Prizes - Intercepts for Restitution and Child Support Payments
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0669
Title
Tobacco Products - Minimum Age and Civil Fines
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0541 (SB0474) Cigarette Restitution Fund - Establishment of Behavioral Health Treatment Account and Funding for Substance Use Treatment Services Delegate Hayes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0625 (SB0080) Criminal Law - Animal Abuse - Penalties and Restitution Delegate Carozza 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0895 (SB0655) Horse Racing - Prizes - Intercepts for Restitution and Child Support Payments Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1428 Criminal Procedure - Victim Services Unit - Victims' Compensation Chair, Judiciary Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/07 at 9:30 a.m.
Judiciary
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/07/2017 - 9:30 AM
SB0080 (HB0625) Criminal Law - Animal Abuse - Penalties and Restitution Senator Mathias 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/18/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0474 (HB0541) Cigarette Restitution Fund - Establishment of Behavioral Health Treatment Account and Funding for Substance Use Treatment Services Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 2:30 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Budget and Taxation
3/01/2017 - 2:30 PM
Finance
SB0655 (HB0895) Horse Racing - Prizes - Intercepts for Restitution and Child Support Payments Senator Peters 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0669 Tobacco Products - Minimum Age and Civil Fines Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:50 PM