Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Restitution

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0247 /CH0422 (SB0963)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Victim Services Unit - Victims' Compensation
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0995
Title
Montgomery County - Residential Leases - Just Cause Eviction MC 15-18
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1225 (SB0987)
Title
Compensation to Individual Erroneously Convicted, Sentenced, and Confined or Whose Conviction or Adjudication is Reversed
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1243
Title
Prevailing Wage Rates - Public Work Contracts - Suits by Employees
Sponsor
Delegate Morales
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1583 (SB0723)
Title
Board of Public Works - Erroneously Convicted Individual - Restitution
Sponsor
Delegate Vallario
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1723 /CH0625
Title
Charles County - Work Release - Collection of Inmate Earnings
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0723 (HB1583)
Title
Board of Public Works - Erroneously Convicted Individual - Restitution
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0963 (HB0247/CH0422)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Victim Services Unit - Victims' Compensation
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0987 (HB1225)
Title
State Finance and Procurement – Grant to Individual Erroneously Convicted, Sentenced, and Confined
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0247 /CH0422 (SB0963) Criminal Procedure - Victim Services Unit - Victims' Compensation Chair, Judiciary Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 422
Judiciary
1/30/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0995 Montgomery County - Residential Leases - Just Cause Eviction MC 15-18 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB1225 (SB0987) Compensation to Individual Erroneously Convicted, Sentenced, and Confined or Whose Conviction or Adjudication is Reversed Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Budget and Taxation
Judiciary
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Judicial Proceedings
Budget and Taxation
HB1243 Prevailing Wage Rates - Public Work Contracts - Suits by Employees Delegate Morales 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Economic Matters
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/04/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1583 (SB0723) Board of Public Works - Erroneously Convicted Individual - Restitution Delegate Vallario 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1723 /CH0625 Charles County - Work Release - Collection of Inmate Earnings Charles County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 625
Judiciary
3/16/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0723 (HB1583) Board of Public Works - Erroneously Convicted Individual - Restitution Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2018 - 3:00 PM
SB0963 (HB0247/CH0422) Criminal Procedure - Victim Services Unit - Victims' Compensation Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2018 - 3:00 PM
Judiciary
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0987 (HB1225) State Finance and Procurement – Grant to Individual Erroneously Convicted, Sentenced, and Confined Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 3:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2018 - 3:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:54 PM