Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Restitution

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0057 (SB0556)
Title
State Government - Legislative and Executive Branches - Workplace Bullying
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0524 /CH0663 (SB0300/CH0009)
Title
Prevailing Wage Rates - Public Work Contracts - Suits by Employees
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0628
Title
Montgomery County - Residential Leases - Just Cause Eviction MC 22-19
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1036 (SB1024)
Title
Criminal Law - Crimes Related to Licensed Gaming - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, J.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1051
Title
Charles County - Landlord and Tenant - Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent - Procedures
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1159
Title
Cigarette Restitution Fund - Establishment of Account
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1184 (SB0191)
Title
Compensation to Individual Erroneously Convicted, Sentenced, and Confined or Whose Conviction or Adjudication Is Reversed
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1194 (SB0760)
Title
Natural Resources Protection Program of 2019
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1218
Title
Wicomico County - Landlord and Tenant - Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent - Procedures
Sponsor
Wicomico County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1274 /CH0537
Title
Opioid Restitution Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0191 (HB1184)
Title
Compensation to Individual Erroneously Convicted, Sentenced, and Confined or Whose Conviction or Adjudication Is Reversed
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0300 /CH0009 (HB0524/CH0663)
Title
Prevailing Wage Rates - Public Work Contracts - Suits by Employees
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0556 (HB0057)
Title
State Government - Legislative and Executive Branches - Workplace Bullying
Sponsor
Senator Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0760 (HB1194)
Title
Natural Resources - Whistleblower Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1024 (HB1036)
Title
Criminal Law - Crimes Related to Licensed Gaming - Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0057 (SB0556) State Government - Legislative and Executive Branches - Workplace Bullying Speaker 6 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; Withdrawn
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB0524 /CH0663 (SB0300/CH0009) Prevailing Wage Rates - Public Work Contracts - Suits by Employees Delegate Wilson 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 663
Economic Matters
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0628 Montgomery County - Residential Leases - Just Cause Eviction MC 22-19 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1036 (SB1024) Criminal Law - Crimes Related to Licensed Gaming - Penalties Delegate Lewis, J. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
3/01/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
HB1051 Charles County - Landlord and Tenant - Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent - Procedures Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
HB1159 Cigarette Restitution Fund - Establishment of Account Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1184 (SB0191) Compensation to Individual Erroneously Convicted, Sentenced, and Confined or Whose Conviction or Adjudication Is Reversed Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB1194 (SB0760) Natural Resources Protection Program of 2019 Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1218 Wicomico County - Landlord and Tenant - Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent - Procedures Wicomico County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2019 - 12:00 PM
HB1274 /CH0537 Opioid Restitution Fund Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 537
Appropriations
2/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Finance
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0191 (HB1184) Compensation to Individual Erroneously Convicted, Sentenced, and Confined or Whose Conviction or Adjudication Is Reversed Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0300 /CH0009 (HB0524/CH0663) Prevailing Wage Rates - Public Work Contracts - Suits by Employees Senator Benson 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 9
Finance
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0556 (HB0057) State Government - Legislative and Executive Branches - Workplace Bullying Senator Miller 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0760 (HB1194) Natural Resources - Whistleblower Program - Establishment Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB1024 (HB1036) Criminal Law - Crimes Related to Licensed Gaming - Penalties Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/14/2019 - 12:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:34 PM