Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Restitution

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0227 (SB0176)
Title
Wicomico County - Landlord and Tenant - Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent - Procedures
Sponsor
Wicomico County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0358 (SB0268)
Title
Victim's Rights - Restitution
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0422
Title
Opioid Restitution Fund - Office of the Chief Medical Examiner
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0626
Title
Baltimore County - Repossession - Disposition of Property
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0658
Title
Local Correctional Facilities - Requirement for Prerelease Program
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0990 (SB0675)
Title
Baltimore County - Foreclosure Proceedings - Affidavit That Property Is Vacant or Unfit for Human Habitation
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1071 (SB0696)
Title
Public Health - Substance-Related Disorder Services (Maryland Patient Protection and Treatment Ethics Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Pippy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1139 (SB1010)
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1562
Title
Action to Collect a Private Education Loan - Required Documents
Sponsor
Delegate Lopez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0176 (HB0227)
Title
Wicomico County - Landlord and Tenant - Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent - Procedures
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0268 (HB0358)
Title
Victim's Rights - Restitution
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0675 (HB0990)
Title
Baltimore County - Foreclosure Proceedings - Affidavit That Property Is Vacant or Unfit for Human Habitation
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0681
Title
Electricity Suppliers and Gas Suppliers - Consumer Protections
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0696 (HB1071)
Title
Public Health - Substance-Related Disorder Services (Maryland Patient Protection and Treatment Ethics Act)
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1010 (HB1139)
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1059
Title
Criminal Procedure - Restitution - Trauma-Informed Restorative Justice
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0227 (SB0176) Wicomico County - Landlord and Tenant - Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent - Procedures Wicomico County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0358 (SB0268) Victim's Rights - Restitution Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0422 Opioid Restitution Fund - Office of the Chief Medical Examiner Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0626 Baltimore County - Repossession - Disposition of Property Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB0658 Local Correctional Facilities - Requirement for Prerelease Program Delegate Haynes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0990 (SB0675) Baltimore County - Foreclosure Proceedings - Affidavit That Property Is Vacant or Unfit for Human Habitation Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1071 (SB0696) Public Health - Substance-Related Disorder Services (Maryland Patient Protection and Treatment Ethics Act) Delegate Pippy 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1139 (SB1010) Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1562 Action to Collect a Private Education Loan - Required Documents Delegate Lopez 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0176 (HB0227) Wicomico County - Landlord and Tenant - Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent - Procedures Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Judicial Proceedings
1/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0268 (HB0358) Victim's Rights - Restitution President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0675 (HB0990) Baltimore County - Foreclosure Proceedings - Affidavit That Property Is Vacant or Unfit for Human Habitation Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0681 Electricity Suppliers and Gas Suppliers - Consumer Protections Senator Washington 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0696 (HB1071) Public Health - Substance-Related Disorder Services (Maryland Patient Protection and Treatment Ethics Act) Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB1010 (HB1139) Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice Senator Peters 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Judicial Proceedings
3/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB1059 Criminal Procedure - Restitution - Trauma-Informed Restorative Justice Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/18/2020 5:02 PM