Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Review Boards

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0257 /CH0094
Title
St. Mary's County - Adult Public Guardianship Review Board - Membership Requirements
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0346 /CH0031 (SB0216/CH0030)
Title
Harford County - Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights
Sponsor
Harford County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0806 /CH0391
Title
Health Occupations - State Board of Social Work Examiners - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Hubbard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1029 (SB0783)
Title
State Board of Physicians - Naturopathic Doctors
Sponsor
Delegate Oaks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1095
Title
Law Enforcement Officers - Disciplinary Actions - Written Policy
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1096 /CH0401 (SB0672)
Title
State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsor
Delegate Hammen
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1257 /CH0674
Title
Land Use - Clarifications and Corrections
Sponsor
Delegate McIntosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1258 (SB1040)
Title
Mental Hygiene - Reform of Laws and Delivery of Services
Sponsor
Delegate Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1280 (SB0677)
Title
Collective Bargaining - State Labor Relations Board and State Higher Education Labor Relations Board - Enforcement Authority
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1296 /CH0597 (SB0981/CH0596)
Title
State Board of Physicians - Quasi-Judicial Powers and the Board of Review - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1313 /CH0583
Title
State Board of Physicians - Consultation, Qualification for Licensure, License Renewal, and Representation to the Public
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1511 (SB1042)
Title
Washington County Building Code Board of Appeals - Decisions
Sponsor
Washington County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0053 /CH0171
Title
Department of Agriculture - Administrative Review of Contested Cases
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0216 /CH0030 (HB0346/CH0031)
Title
Harford County - Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights
Sponsor
Senator Glassman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0672 (HB1096/CH0401)
Title
State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsor
Senator Conway
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0677 (HB1280)
Title
Collective Bargaining - State Labor Relations Board and State Higher Education Labor Relations Board - Enforcement Authority
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0783 (HB1029)
Title
State Board of Physicians - Naturopathic Doctors
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0981 /CH0596 (HB1296/CH0597)
Title
State Board of Physicians - Quasi-Judicial Powers and the Board of Review - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Montgomery
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1040 (HB1258)
Title
Mental Hygiene - Reform of Laws and Delivery of Services
Sponsor
Senator Garagiola
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1042 (HB1511)
Title
Washington County Building Code Board of Appeals - Decisions
Sponsor
Senator Shank
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0257 /CH0094 St. Mary's County - Adult Public Guardianship Review Board - Membership Requirements St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 94
Judiciary
2/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0346 /CH0031 (SB0216/CH0030) Harford County - Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights Harford County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 31
Appropriations
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0806 /CH0391 Health Occupations - State Board of Social Work Examiners - Revisions Delegate Hubbard 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 391
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/03/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1029 (SB0783) State Board of Physicians - Naturopathic Doctors Delegate Oaks 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1095 Law Enforcement Officers - Disciplinary Actions - Written Policy Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1096 /CH0401 (SB0672) State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation Delegate Hammen 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 401
Health and Government Operations
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1257 /CH0674 Land Use - Clarifications and Corrections Delegate McIntosh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 674
Environmental Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1258 (SB1040) Mental Hygiene - Reform of Laws and Delivery of Services Delegate Hough 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1280 (SB0677) Collective Bargaining - State Labor Relations Board and State Higher Education Labor Relations Board - Enforcement Authority Delegate Haynes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1296 /CH0597 (SB0981/CH0596) State Board of Physicians - Quasi-Judicial Powers and the Board of Review - Revisions Delegate Cullison 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 597
Health and Government Operations
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1313 /CH0583 State Board of Physicians - Consultation, Qualification for Licensure, License Renewal, and Representation to the Public Delegate Cullison 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 583
Health and Government Operations
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1511 (SB1042) Washington County Building Code Board of Appeals - Decisions Washington County Delegation 4 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0053 /CH0171 Department of Agriculture - Administrative Review of Contested Cases Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 171
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/15/2013 - 2:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0216 /CH0030 (HB0346/CH0031) Harford County - Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights Senator Glassman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 30
Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2013 - 2:00 PM
Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0672 (HB1096/CH0401) State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation Senator Conway 6 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0677 (HB1280) Collective Bargaining - State Labor Relations Board and State Higher Education Labor Relations Board - Enforcement Authority Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0783 (HB1029) State Board of Physicians - Naturopathic Doctors Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0981 /CH0596 (HB1296/CH0597) State Board of Physicians - Quasi-Judicial Powers and the Board of Review - Revisions Senator Montgomery 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 596
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/03/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB1040 (HB1258) Mental Hygiene - Reform of Laws and Delivery of Services Senator Garagiola 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB1042 (HB1511) Washington County Building Code Board of Appeals - Decisions Senator Shank 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:41 PM