Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Review Boards

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0179 /CH0087
Title
Adult Public Guardianship Review Board - Membership
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0235
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and Correctional Officers
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0388 (SB0953)
Title
Inmates - Life Imprisonment - Parole Approval
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0592 /CH0315 (SB0620/CH0314)
Title
Mental Health - Approval by Clinical Review Panel of Administration of Medication - Standard
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0606 (SB0067)
Title
Mental Hygiene - Standards for Emergency Evaluation and Involuntary Admission - Modification
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1456 /CH0457
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Board of Review - Jurisdiction
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0067 (HB0606)
Title
Mental Hygiene - Standards for Emergency Evaluation and Involuntary Admission - Modification
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0096 /CH0023
Title
Health Insurance - Conformity With and Implementation of the Federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0620 /CH0314 (HB0592/CH0315)
Title
Mental Health - Approval by Clinical Review Panel of Administration of Medication - Standard
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0953 (HB0388)
Title
Inmates - Life Imprisonment - Parole Approval
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0179 /CH0087 Adult Public Guardianship Review Board - Membership Chair, Judiciary Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 87
Judiciary
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0235 Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and Correctional Officers Delegate Kelly, K. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0388 (SB0953) Inmates - Life Imprisonment - Parole Approval Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0592 /CH0315 (SB0620/CH0314) Mental Health - Approval by Clinical Review Panel of Administration of Medication - Standard Delegate Morhaim 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 315
Health and Government Operations
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0606 (SB0067) Mental Hygiene - Standards for Emergency Evaluation and Involuntary Admission - Modification Delegate Morhaim 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1456 /CH0457 Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Board of Review - Jurisdiction Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 457
Health and Government Operations
3/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0067 (HB0606) Mental Hygiene - Standards for Emergency Evaluation and Involuntary Admission - Modification Senator Middleton 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0096 /CH0023 Health Insurance - Conformity With and Implementation of the Federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 23
Finance
1/15/2014 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0620 /CH0314 (HB0592/CH0315) Mental Health - Approval by Clinical Review Panel of Administration of Medication - Standard Senator Kelley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 314
Finance
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0953 (HB0388) Inmates - Life Imprisonment - Parole Approval Senator Gladden 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:43 PM