Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Review Boards

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0121 /CH0490
Title
Criminal Procedure - Drug-Related Offenses - Departure From Mandatory Minimum Sentences
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0457
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Murder of Law Enforcement Officer, Correctional Officer, First Responder, or Witness
Sponsor
Delegate McDonough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0574 (SB0449/CH0034)
Title
State Board of Physicians - Physicians, Physician Assistants, and Allied Health Practitioners - Licensure Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0677
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Independent Review Board - Refunds MC/PG 106-15
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0731
Title
Law Enforcement Officers - Disciplinary Actions - Written Policy
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0755 /CH0136 (SB0695/CH0135)
Title
General Provisions - Public Information Act - Enforcement, Fees, and Exemptions
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0867
Title
Public Information Act - State Public Information Act Compliance Board and State Policy
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0968 (SB0566)
Title
Law Enforcement Officers' Bill of Rights - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1198 (SB0882/CH0130)
Title
Baltimore City Civilian Review Board
Sponsor
Delegate Oaks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0399
Title
Health Care Malpractice Claims - Use of Clinical Practice Guidelines
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0449 /CH0034 (HB0574)
Title
State Board of Physicians - Physicians, Physician Assistants, and Allied Health Practitioners - Licensure Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0566 (HB0968)
Title
Law Enforcement Officers' Bill of Rights - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0695 /CH0135 (HB0755/CH0136)
Title
General Provisions - Public Information Act - Enforcement, Fees, and Exemptions
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0757 /CH0381
Title
Public Health - Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Required Disclosures
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0882 /CH0130 (HB1198)
Title
Baltimore City Civilian Review Board
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0121 /CH0490 Criminal Procedure - Drug-Related Offenses - Departure From Mandatory Minimum Sentences Delegate Anderson 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 490
Judiciary
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0457 Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Murder of Law Enforcement Officer, Correctional Officer, First Responder, or Witness Delegate McDonough 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0574 (SB0449/CH0034) State Board of Physicians - Physicians, Physician Assistants, and Allied Health Practitioners - Licensure Requirements Delegate Robinson, B. 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Health and Government Operations
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0677 Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Independent Review Board - Refunds MC/PG 106-15 Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB0731 Law Enforcement Officers - Disciplinary Actions - Written Policy Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0755 /CH0136 (SB0695/CH0135) General Provisions - Public Information Act - Enforcement, Fees, and Exemptions Delegate Cullison 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 136
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0867 Public Information Act - State Public Information Act Compliance Board and State Policy Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0968 (SB0566) Law Enforcement Officers' Bill of Rights - Alterations Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1198 (SB0882/CH0130) Baltimore City Civilian Review Board Delegate Oaks 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
3/20/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0399 Health Care Malpractice Claims - Use of Clinical Practice Guidelines Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0449 /CH0034 (HB0574) State Board of Physicians - Physicians, Physician Assistants, and Allied Health Practitioners - Licensure Requirements Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 34
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0566 (HB0968) Law Enforcement Officers' Bill of Rights - Alterations Senator Gladden 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0695 /CH0135 (HB0755/CH0136) General Provisions - Public Information Act - Enforcement, Fees, and Exemptions Senator Raskin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 135
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/06/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0757 /CH0381 Public Health - Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Required Disclosures Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 381
Finance
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0882 /CH0130 (HB1198) Baltimore City Civilian Review Board Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 130
Judicial Proceedings
3/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/13/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:42 PM