Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Review Boards

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0370 /CH0353 (SB0279/CH0354)
Title
Metro Board Member Act
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0600 (SB0131)
Title
Child Abuse and Neglect - Training
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0652
Title
Health Occupations - Violations of the Maryland Dentistry Act - Penalties and Cease and Desist Orders
Sponsor
Delegate West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0653 /CH0215 (SB0522/CH0216)
Title
Health Care Providers - Opioid and Benzodiazepine Prescriptions - Discussion of Benefits and Risks
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0819 /CH0253 (SB0741)
Title
Public Safety – Handgun Permit Review Board – Appeals
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0863 /CH0483 (SB0698)
Title
State Board of Nursing - Advanced Practice Registered Nurses - Certification and Practice
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0887
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Murder of Specific Individuals or Mass Murder
Sponsor
Delegate Shoemaker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1145
Title
Public Safety - Handgun Permit - Issuance and Appeal
Sponsor
Delegate Rey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1193
Title
Physicians – Discipline – Procedures and Effects
Sponsor
Delegate West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1266 (SB0950)
Title
Health Occupations - Treatment of Lyme Disease and Other Tick-Borne Diseases - Disciplinary Actions
Sponsor
Delegate Carey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1822
Title
Task Force to Study the Baltimore Police Department
Sponsor
Delegate Ali
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0279 /CH0354 (HB0370/CH0353)
Title
Metro Board Member Act
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0522 /CH0216 (HB0653/CH0215)
Title
Health Care Providers - Opioid and Benzodiazepine Prescriptions - Discussion of Benefits and Risks
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0552 /CH0757 (HB0742/CH0756)
Title
State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0741 (HB0819/CH0253)
Title
Public Safety – Handgun Permit Review Board – Appeals
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0816
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First Responders
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0950 (HB1266)
Title
Health Occupations – Treatment of Lyme Disease and Other Tick–Borne Diseases – Disciplinary Actions
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1209 (HB1158)
Title
Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0370 /CH0353 (SB0279/CH0354) Metro Board Member Act Delegate Korman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 353
Environment and Transportation
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0600 (SB0131) Child Abuse and Neglect - Training Delegate McComas 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0652 Health Occupations - Violations of the Maryland Dentistry Act - Penalties and Cease and Desist Orders Delegate West 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0653 /CH0215 (SB0522/CH0216) Health Care Providers - Opioid and Benzodiazepine Prescriptions - Discussion of Benefits and Risks Delegate Young, K. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 215
Health and Government Operations
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0819 /CH0253 (SB0741) Public Safety – Handgun Permit Review Board – Appeals Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 253
Judiciary
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0863 /CH0483 (SB0698) State Board of Nursing - Advanced Practice Registered Nurses - Certification and Practice Delegate Cullison 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 483
Health and Government Operations
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0887 Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Murder of Specific Individuals or Mass Murder Delegate Shoemaker 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1145 Public Safety - Handgun Permit - Issuance and Appeal Delegate Rey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1193 Physicians – Discipline – Procedures and Effects Delegate West 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1266 (SB0950) Health Occupations - Treatment of Lyme Disease and Other Tick-Borne Diseases - Disciplinary Actions Delegate Carey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1822 Task Force to Study the Baltimore Police Department Delegate Ali 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0279 /CH0354 (HB0370/CH0353) Metro Board Member Act Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 354
Finance
2/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0522 /CH0216 (HB0653/CH0215) Health Care Providers - Opioid and Benzodiazepine Prescriptions - Discussion of Benefits and Risks Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 216
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0552 /CH0757 (HB0742/CH0756) State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 757
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0741 (HB0819/CH0253) Public Safety – Handgun Permit Review Board – Appeals Senator Madaleno 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/04/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0816 Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First Responders Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0950 (HB1266) Health Occupations – Treatment of Lyme Disease and Other Tick–Borne Diseases – Disciplinary Actions Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1209 (HB1158) Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:54 PM