Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Review Boards

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0043
Title
Criminal Procedure – Plea Agreement Terms and the Violence Prevention Initiative Criteria
Sponsor
Delegate Metzgar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0136
Title
Environment - On-Site Wastewater Services - Regulation
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0893
Title
Washington County - Adult Public Guardianship Review Board - Membership
Sponsor
Washington County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1476
Title
Independent Oversight and Review Board for Health Care of Inmates in State Correctional Facilities - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, J.
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0043 Criminal Procedure – Plea Agreement Terms and the Violence Prevention Initiative Criteria Delegate Metzgar 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
1/21/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0136 Environment - On-Site Wastewater Services - Regulation Delegate Stein 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0893 Washington County - Adult Public Guardianship Review Board - Membership Washington County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Judiciary
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1476 Independent Oversight and Review Board for Health Care of Inmates in State Correctional Facilities - Establishment Delegate Lewis, J. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/17/2020 12:11 PM