Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Ridesharing

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0120 /CH0064 (SB0171/CH0065)
Title
Motor Carriers and For-Hire Driving Services - Nonprofit Organizations and Volunteer Drivers
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0158 /CH0086
Title
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections - Standards and Requirements
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0386
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Transportation Network Services - Application and Rates
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0557 /CH0252 (SB0607/CH0253)
Title
Motor Scooter and Electric Low Speed Scooter Sharing Companies – Nonvisual Access
Sponsor
Delegate Attar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0841 (SB0573/CH0567)
Title
Peer–to–Peer Car Sharing – Sales Tax Sunset Extension and Study
Sponsor
Delegate Chang
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1170 (SB0825)
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Peer-to-Peer Car Sharing - Sunset Repeal and Rate Alteration
Sponsor
Delegate Kaiser
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0171 /CH0065 (HB0120/CH0064)
Title
Motor Carriers and For-Hire Driving Services - Nonprofit Organizations and Volunteer Drivers
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0573 /CH0567 (HB0841)
Title
Peer–to–Peer Car Sharing – Sales Tax Sunset Extension and Study
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0607 /CH0253 (HB0557/CH0252)
Title
Motor Scooter and Electric Low Speed Scooter Sharing Companies – Nonvisual Access
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0825 (HB1170)
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Peer-to-Peer Car Sharing - Sunset Repeal and Rate Alteration
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0120 /CH0064 (SB0171/CH0065) Motor Carriers and For-Hire Driving Services - Nonprofit Organizations and Volunteer Drivers Delegate Dumais 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 64
Economic Matters
1/30/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0158 /CH0086 Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections - Standards and Requirements Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 86
Environment and Transportation
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0386 Sales and Use Tax - Transportation Network Services - Application and Rates Delegate Lewis, R. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0557 /CH0252 (SB0607/CH0253) Motor Scooter and Electric Low Speed Scooter Sharing Companies – Nonvisual Access Delegate Attar 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 252
Environment and Transportation
2/20/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0841 (SB0573/CH0567) Peer–to–Peer Car Sharing – Sales Tax Sunset Extension and Study Delegate Chang 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation
Ways and Means
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1170 (SB0825) Sales and Use Tax - Peer-to-Peer Car Sharing - Sunset Repeal and Rate Alteration Delegate Kaiser 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0171 /CH0065 (HB0120/CH0064) Motor Carriers and For-Hire Driving Services - Nonprofit Organizations and Volunteer Drivers Senator Guzzone 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 65
Finance
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0573 /CH0567 (HB0841) Peer–to–Peer Car Sharing – Sales Tax Sunset Extension and Study Senator McCray 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 567
Budget and Taxation
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0607 /CH0253 (HB0557/CH0252) Motor Scooter and Electric Low Speed Scooter Sharing Companies – Nonvisual Access Senator Benson 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 253
Finance
3/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0825 (HB1170) Sales and Use Tax - Peer-to-Peer Car Sharing - Sunset Repeal and Rate Alteration Senator McCray 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/11/2020 4:24 PM