Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Rivers and Streams

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0357 /CH0235 (SB0344/CH0234)
Title
Potomac River Fisheries Commission - Inspection Tax and Penalty
Sponsor
Delegate Wood
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0561 /CH0315 (SB0748/CH0314)
Title
Agriculture - Nutrient Management - Limiting Applicability
Sponsor
Delegate Hubbard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0706 /CH0384
Title
Natural Resources - Forest Preservation Act of 2013
Sponsor
Chair, Environmental Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0766 /CH0139
Title
Environment - Severn River Watershed - Silt and Erosion Control - Certification
Sponsor
Delegate Frush
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0797 /CH0140
Title
Transportation Projects - Transportation Facilities - Water Access
Sponsor
Delegate McIntosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0837
Title
Family Farm - Prevailing Party - Attorney's Fees and Expenses
Sponsor
Delegate McDermott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0993
Title
Natural Resources - Public Waters - Public Right to Use and Enjoy
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1244 (SB0795)
Title
Oyster Dredging - Waters North of the Chesapeake Bay Bridge and Kent Narrows Bridge
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1477 (SB1021)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Dorchester County - Sailwinds Wharf Development Project
Sponsor
Delegate Cane
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1528
Title
Natural Resources - Patuxent River - Drifting Gill Nets
Sponsor
Delegate O'Donnell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0344 /CH0234 (HB0357/CH0235)
Title
Potomac River Fisheries Commission - Inspection Tax and Penalty
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0748 /CH0314 (HB0561/CH0315)
Title
Agriculture - Nutrient Management - Limiting Applicability
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0795 (HB1244)
Title
Oyster Dredging - Waters North of the Chesapeake Bay Bridge and Kent Narrows Bridge
Sponsor
Senator Pipkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0920 /CH0333
Title
Natural Resources - Submerged Land and Water Column Leases - Herring Creek
Sponsor
Senator Dyson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0979
Title
Environment - Watershed Implementation Plan - Conowingo Dam Environmental Assessment
Sponsor
Senator Pipkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1021 (HB1477)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Dorchester County - Sailwinds Wharf Development Project
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0357 /CH0235 (SB0344/CH0234) Potomac River Fisheries Commission - Inspection Tax and Penalty Delegate Wood 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 235
Environmental Matters
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0561 /CH0315 (SB0748/CH0314) Agriculture - Nutrient Management - Limiting Applicability Delegate Hubbard 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 315
Environmental Matters
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0706 /CH0384 Natural Resources - Forest Preservation Act of 2013 Chair, Environmental Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 384
Environmental Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0766 /CH0139 Environment - Severn River Watershed - Silt and Erosion Control - Certification Delegate Frush 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 139
Environmental Matters
2/22/2013 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0797 /CH0140 Transportation Projects - Transportation Facilities - Water Access Delegate McIntosh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 140
Environmental Matters
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0837 Family Farm - Prevailing Party - Attorney's Fees and Expenses Delegate McDermott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0993 Natural Resources - Public Waters - Public Right to Use and Enjoy Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1244 (SB0795) Oyster Dredging - Waters North of the Chesapeake Bay Bridge and Kent Narrows Bridge Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1477 (SB1021) Creation of a State Debt - Dorchester County - Sailwinds Wharf Development Project Delegate Cane 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/09/2013 - 3:00 PM
HB1528 Natural Resources - Patuxent River - Drifting Gill Nets Delegate O'Donnell 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0344 /CH0234 (HB0357/CH0235) Potomac River Fisheries Commission - Inspection Tax and Penalty Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 234
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/03/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0748 /CH0314 (HB0561/CH0315) Agriculture - Nutrient Management - Limiting Applicability Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 314
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/03/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0795 (HB1244) Oyster Dredging - Waters North of the Chesapeake Bay Bridge and Kent Narrows Bridge Senator Pipkin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0920 /CH0333 Natural Resources - Submerged Land and Water Column Leases - Herring Creek Senator Dyson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 333
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/03/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0979 Environment - Watershed Implementation Plan - Conowingo Dam Environmental Assessment Senator Pipkin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB1021 (HB1477) Creation of a State Debt - Dorchester County - Sailwinds Wharf Development Project Senator Colburn 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 11:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2013 - 11:00 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:41 PM