Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Rivers and Streams

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0062 /CH0085
Title
Natural Resources - Fishing and Hunting Licenses
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0063 /CH0086
Title
Natural Resources - Fishing - Regulation and Use of Commercial Finfish Trotlines
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0766 /CH0117
Title
Natural Resources - Fish and Fisheries
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0870 /CH0585 (SB0876/CH0584)
Title
Natural Resources - Black Fly Management and Control - Washington County
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1110 (SB0645)
Title
Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Allocation of Funds
Sponsor
Delegate Frush
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1169 (SB0963)
Title
Harris Creek Oyster Restoration - Vessel Damage - Compensation
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1346 (SB0045)
Title
Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Use of Funds
Sponsor
Delegate Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0045 (HB1346)
Title
Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Use of Funds
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0061 /CH0043
Title
Natural Resources - Forest Lands and the Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Miscellaneous Corrections and Clarifications
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0645 (HB1110)
Title
Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Allocation of Funds
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0963 (HB1169)
Title
Harris Creek Oyster Restoration - Vessel Damage - Compensation
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0001 /JR0001
Title
Patuxent River Watershed - Amendment of Patuxent River Policy Plan
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0062 /CH0085 Natural Resources - Fishing and Hunting Licenses Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 85
Environment and Transportation
1/27/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0063 /CH0086 Natural Resources - Fishing - Regulation and Use of Commercial Finfish Trotlines Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 86
Environment and Transportation
1/27/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0766 /CH0117 Natural Resources - Fish and Fisheries Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 117
Environment and Transportation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0870 /CH0585 (SB0876/CH0584) Natural Resources - Black Fly Management and Control - Washington County Delegate Parrott 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 585
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1110 (SB0645) Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Allocation of Funds Delegate Frush 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
HB1169 (SB0963) Harris Creek Oyster Restoration - Vessel Damage - Compensation Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1346 (SB0045) Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Use of Funds Delegate Simonaire 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0045 (HB1346) Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Use of Funds Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/19 at 2:30 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/19/2016 - 2:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0061 /CH0043 Natural Resources - Forest Lands and the Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Miscellaneous Corrections and Clarifications Senator Simonaire 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 43
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/19/2016 - 2:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0645 (HB1110) Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Allocation of Funds Senator King 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0963 (HB1169) Harris Creek Oyster Restoration - Vessel Damage - Compensation Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
SJ0001 /JR0001 Patuxent River Watershed - Amendment of Patuxent River Policy Plan Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Signed by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 1
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/19/2016 - 2:30 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
4/01/2016 - 3:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:48 PM