Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Rivers, Streams, and Lakes

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0219 /CH0162 (SB0115/CH0161)
Title
Deep Creek Lake Policy and Review Board - Membership and Duties
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0654 (SB0264)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Annapolis Maritime Museum and Park
Sponsor
Delegate Busch
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0696 /CH0271 (SB0601/CH0270)
Title
Carroll County - Scenic River Advisory Board - Composition
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0719
Title
On-Site Sewage Disposal Systems - Best Available Technology for Nitrogen Removal - Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0738 (SB0370)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Frederick County - Culler Lake Revitalization
Sponsor
Delegate Krimm
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0801 (SB0501/CH0698)
Title
State Lakes Protection and Restoration Fund - Purpose, Use, and Funding - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0917 /CH0275 (SB1032/CH0274)
Title
Frederick County - Scenic River Advisory Board - Composition
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0947 (SB0958)
Title
Natural Resources - Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Purpose and Authorized Use of Funds
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1077 (SB1070)
Title
Wetlands and Waterways Program – State–Owned Lakes – Structural Shoreline Stabilization
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1390
Title
Land Use - Development Rights and Responsibilities Agreements - Enhanced Public Benefits
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1420
Title
Environment - Stormwater Management - Nontidal Floodwater
Sponsor
Delegate Flanagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0115 /CH0161 (HB0219/CH0162)
Title
Deep Creek Lake Policy and Review Board – Membership and Duties
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0264 (HB0654)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Annapolis Maritime Museum and Park
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0370 (HB0738)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Frederick County - Culler Lake Revitalization
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0501 /CH0698 (HB0801)
Title
State Lakes Protection and Restoration Fund – Purpose, Use, and Funding – Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0601 /CH0270 (HB0696/CH0271)
Title
Carroll County – Scenic River Advisory Board – Composition
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0958 (HB0947)
Title
Natural Resources - Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Purpose and Authorized Use of Funds
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1032 /CH0274 (HB0917/CH0275)
Title
Frederick County - Scenic River Advisory Board - Composition
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1070 (HB1077)
Title
Wetlands and Waterways Program – State–Owned Lakes – Structural Shoreline Stabilization
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0219 /CH0162 (SB0115/CH0161) Deep Creek Lake Policy and Review Board - Membership and Duties Delegate Beitzel 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 162
Environment and Transportation
2/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0654 (SB0264) Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Annapolis Maritime Museum and Park Delegate Busch 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/10/2018 - 9:00 AM
HB0696 /CH0271 (SB0601/CH0270) Carroll County - Scenic River Advisory Board - Composition Carroll County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 271
Environment and Transportation
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0719 On-Site Sewage Disposal Systems - Best Available Technology for Nitrogen Removal - Requirement Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0738 (SB0370) Creation of a State Debt - Frederick County - Culler Lake Revitalization Delegate Krimm 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/10/2018 - 12:00 PM
HB0801 (SB0501/CH0698) State Lakes Protection and Restoration Fund - Purpose, Use, and Funding - Alterations Delegate Beitzel 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Environment and Transportation
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB0917 /CH0275 (SB1032/CH0274) Frederick County - Scenic River Advisory Board - Composition Frederick County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 275
Environment and Transportation
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0947 (SB0958) Natural Resources - Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Purpose and Authorized Use of Funds Delegate Beitzel 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1077 (SB1070) Wetlands and Waterways Program – State–Owned Lakes – Structural Shoreline Stabilization Delegate Beitzel 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1390 Land Use - Development Rights and Responsibilities Agreements - Enhanced Public Benefits Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1420 Environment - Stormwater Management - Nontidal Floodwater Delegate Flanagan 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0115 /CH0161 (HB0219/CH0162) Deep Creek Lake Policy and Review Board – Membership and Duties Senator Edwards 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 161
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/25/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0264 (HB0654) Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Annapolis Maritime Museum and Park Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 11:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 11:00 AM
SB0370 (HB0738) Creation of a State Debt - Frederick County - Culler Lake Revitalization Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 10:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 10:00 AM
SB0501 /CH0698 (HB0801) State Lakes Protection and Restoration Fund – Purpose, Use, and Funding – Alterations Senator Edwards 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 698
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0601 /CH0270 (HB0696/CH0271) Carroll County – Scenic River Advisory Board – Composition Senator Hough 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 270
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0958 (HB0947) Natural Resources - Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Purpose and Authorized Use of Funds Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1032 /CH0274 (HB0917/CH0275) Frederick County - Scenic River Advisory Board - Composition Senator Hough 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 274
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB1070 (HB1077) Wetlands and Waterways Program – State–Owned Lakes – Structural Shoreline Stabilization Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:54 PM