Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Rivers, Streams, and Lakes

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0095 (SB0162)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Natural Resources - Fishing With a Haul Seine
Sponsor
Delegate Howard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0210 (SB0342)
Title
Aquaculture - Leases in Water Column - Riparian Right of First Refusal
Sponsor
Delegate Crosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0344
Title
Video Lottery Operation License - Expansion and Alterations
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0687 (SB0597)
Title
Agriculture - Cost-Sharing Program - Fixed Natural Filter Practices
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0877 (SB0582)
Title
Natural Resources - State Lakes Protection and Restoration Program and Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0086
Title
Natural Resources - Fishing and Hunting Rights
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0114
Title
Natural Resources - Nuisance Organisms - Pilot Projects and Northern Snakeheads
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0162 (HB0095)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Natural Resources - Fishing With a Haul Seine
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0242
Title
Natural Resources - Wild Waterfowl Policy - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0342 (HB0210)
Title
Aquaculture - Leases in Water Column - Riparian Right of First Refusal
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0582 (HB0877)
Title
Natural Resources - State Lakes Protection and Restoration Program and Fund
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0597 (HB0687)
Title
Agriculture - Cost-Sharing Program - Fixed Natural Filter Practices
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0955 (HB1465)
Title
Federal Clean Water Act - Authority of State
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0004
Title
Recognition of Maryland License Suspensions and Revocations by the Potomac River Fisheries Commission
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0095 (SB0162) Anne Arundel County - Natural Resources - Fishing With a Haul Seine Delegate Howard 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0210 (SB0342) Aquaculture - Leases in Water Column - Riparian Right of First Refusal Delegate Crosby 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB0344 Video Lottery Operation License - Expansion and Alterations Charles County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB0687 (SB0597) Agriculture - Cost-Sharing Program - Fixed Natural Filter Practices Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0877 (SB0582) Natural Resources - State Lakes Protection and Restoration Program and Fund Delegate Beitzel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0086 Natural Resources - Fishing and Hunting Rights Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/23/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0114 Natural Resources - Nuisance Organisms - Pilot Projects and Northern Snakeheads Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/23/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0162 (HB0095) Anne Arundel County - Natural Resources - Fishing With a Haul Seine Senator Elfreth 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/29/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0242 Natural Resources - Wild Waterfowl Policy - Repeal Senator Bailey 2 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/29/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0342 (HB0210) Aquaculture - Leases in Water Column - Riparian Right of First Refusal Senator Bailey 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0582 (HB0877) Natural Resources - State Lakes Protection and Restoration Program and Fund Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0597 (HB0687) Agriculture - Cost-Sharing Program - Fixed Natural Filter Practices Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0955 (HB1465) Federal Clean Water Act - Authority of State Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
SJ0004 Recognition of Maryland License Suspensions and Revocations by the Potomac River Fisheries Commission Senator Bailey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 2/20/2020 5:46 PM