Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Rivers, Streams, and Lakes

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0631 (SB0450)
Title
State Lakes Protection and Restoration Fund - Purpose, Use, and Funding - Sunset Extension
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0693 (SB0799)
Title
Cecil County - Fishing - Restrictions
Sponsor
Cecil County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0833 (SB0618)
Title
Natural Resources - State Lakes Protection and Restoration Fund - Mandatory Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0843
Title
Anne Arundel County - Natural Resources - Fishing With a Haul Seine
Sponsor
Delegate Howard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0911
Title
Natural Resources - Waterfowl Hunting - Susquehanna Flats
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0450 (HB0631)
Title
State Lakes Protection and Restoration Fund - Purpose, Use, and Funding - Sunset Extension
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0618 (HB0833)
Title
Natural Resources - State Lakes Protection and Restoration Fund - Mandatory Funding
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0737
Title
Comprehensive Conservation Finance Act
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0799 (HB0693)
Title
Cecil County - Fishing - Restrictions
Sponsor
Senator Gallion
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0631 (SB0450) State Lakes Protection and Restoration Fund - Purpose, Use, and Funding - Sunset Extension Delegate Beitzel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/10/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0693 (SB0799) Cecil County - Fishing - Restrictions Cecil County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0833 (SB0618) Natural Resources - State Lakes Protection and Restoration Fund - Mandatory Funding Delegate Buckel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
Appropriations
HB0843 Anne Arundel County - Natural Resources - Fishing With a Haul Seine Delegate Howard 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0911 Natural Resources - Waterfowl Hunting - Susquehanna Flats Delegate Lisanti 2 2 In the House - Hearing canceled
Environment and Transportation
SB0450 (HB0631) State Lakes Protection and Restoration Fund - Purpose, Use, and Funding - Sunset Extension Senator Edwards 2 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/10/2021 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0618 (HB0833) Natural Resources - State Lakes Protection and Restoration Fund - Mandatory Funding Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 12:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/24/2021 - 12:00 PM
SB0737 Comprehensive Conservation Finance Act Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) and Hearing canceled (Appropriations)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2021 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/01/2021 - 1:30 PM
Appropriations
SB0799 (HB0693) Cecil County - Fishing - Restrictions Senator Gallion 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/10/2021 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/31/2021 1:06 PM
Click to return on the top page