Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Robbery

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0933
Title
Juvenile Offenders - Dual Sentencing
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1308 (SB0919)
Title
Criminal Law – Felony First–Degree Murder – Limitation and Review of Conviction
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1338
Title
Criminal Law - Felony Murder - Limitation and Review of Convictions for Children
Sponsor
Delegate Crutchfield
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0919 (HB1308)
Title
Criminal Law - Task Force to Study Felony Murder
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0951
Title
Criminal Law - Felony First-Degree Murder - Limitation and Resentencing Procedure
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0933 Juvenile Offenders - Dual Sentencing Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/20/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1308 (SB0919) Criminal Law – Felony First–Degree Murder – Limitation and Review of Conviction Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1338 Criminal Law - Felony Murder - Limitation and Review of Convictions for Children Delegate Crutchfield 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0919 (HB1308) Criminal Law - Task Force to Study Felony Murder Senator Carter 2 2 In the House - First Reading Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2020 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0951 Criminal Law - Felony First-Degree Murder - Limitation and Resentencing Procedure Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2020 - 12:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/17/2020 8:37 PM