Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Rural Areas

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0121
Title
St. Mary’s County – Metropolitan Commission – Collection of Fees, Assessments, and Nonsubstantive and Clarifying Revisions
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0125 (SB0148)
Title
Board of Public Works - Land Acquisition - Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Healey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0277 (SB0367)
Title
State Department of Education - Guidelines on Trauma-Informed Approach
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0464 (SB0990)
Title
Public Health - Overdose and Infectious Disease Prevention Services Program
Sponsor
Delegate Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0847
Title
State Coordinator for Autism Strategy and Advisory Stakeholder Group on Autism-Related Needs
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0957 (SB1005)
Title
Commercial Law - Maryland Net Neutrality Act of 2020
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0999 (SB0540)
Title
Member-Regulated Cooperatives - Establishment (Rural Broadband for the Eastern Shore Act of 2020)
Sponsor
Delegate Sample-Hughes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1425 (SB0926)
Title
Climate Solutions Act of 2020 – Greenhouse Gas Emissions Reduction Act
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1504 (SB1015)
Title
Task Force to Study Access to Mental Health Care in Higher Education
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1584
Title
Public Health - Family Planning Services - Order of Priority of Funding (Prioritization of Public Funding for Family Planning Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0367 (HB0277)
Title
State Department of Education - Guidelines on Trauma-Informed Approach
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0540 (HB0999)
Title
Member-Regulated Cooperatives - Establishment (Rural Broadband for the Eastern Shore Act of 2020)
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0926 (HB1425)
Title
Climate Solutions Act of 2020 – Greenhouse Gas Emissions Reduction Act
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0990 (HB0464)
Title
Public Health - Overdose and Infectious Disease Prevention Services Program
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1005 (HB0957)
Title
Commercial Law - Internet Privacy and Net Neutrality
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1015 (HB1504)
Title
Task Force to Study Access to Mental Health Care in Higher Education
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0121 St. Mary’s County – Metropolitan Commission – Collection of Fees, Assessments, and Nonsubstantive and Clarifying Revisions St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0125 (SB0148) Board of Public Works - Land Acquisition - Requirements Delegate Healey 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Health and Government Operations
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0277 (SB0367) State Department of Education - Guidelines on Trauma-Informed Approach Delegate Wilkins 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Ways and Means
2/05/2020 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0464 (SB0990) Public Health - Overdose and Infectious Disease Prevention Services Program Delegate Hettleman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0847 State Coordinator for Autism Strategy and Advisory Stakeholder Group on Autism-Related Needs Delegate Guyton 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Health and Government Operations
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0957 (SB1005) Commercial Law - Maryland Net Neutrality Act of 2020 Delegate Reznik 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0999 (SB0540) Member-Regulated Cooperatives - Establishment (Rural Broadband for the Eastern Shore Act of 2020) Delegate Sample-Hughes 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Economic Matters
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1425 (SB0926) Climate Solutions Act of 2020 – Greenhouse Gas Emissions Reduction Act Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB1504 (SB1015) Task Force to Study Access to Mental Health Care in Higher Education Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1584 Public Health - Family Planning Services - Order of Priority of Funding (Prioritization of Public Funding for Family Planning Act) Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0367 (HB0277) State Department of Education - Guidelines on Trauma-Informed Approach Senator Washington 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0540 (HB0999) Member-Regulated Cooperatives - Establishment (Rural Broadband for the Eastern Shore Act of 2020) Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0926 (HB1425) Climate Solutions Act of 2020 – Greenhouse Gas Emissions Reduction Act Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0990 (HB0464) Public Health - Overdose and Infectious Disease Prevention Services Program Senator Hettleman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB1005 (HB0957) Commercial Law - Internet Privacy and Net Neutrality Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SB1015 (HB1504) Task Force to Study Access to Mental Health Care in Higher Education Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/19/2020 12:20 PM