Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Sales and Use Tax

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0020
Title
Primary and Secondary Education - Security - School Resource Officers
Sponsor
Delegate Cluster
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0056
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Periods - School Supplies and Textbooks
Sponsor
Delegate Vitale
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0063
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - University and College Textbooks
Sponsor
Delegate Smigiel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0162 (SB0172/CH0464)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2014
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0347 (SB0365)
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Rate Reduction
Sponsor
Delegate Schuh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0415
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Ammunition and Firearms - Developmental Disabilities Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0429
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Week - School Supplies
Sponsor
Delegate Hogan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0554 (SB0625)
Title
Commission on Tax Policy, Reform, and Fairness
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0718 (SB0707)
Title
Community Cleanup and Greening Act of 2014
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0784 (SB0732)
Title
Income Tax Credit - Emergency Backup Generators
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0786 /CH0424 (SB0417)
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Weekend - Exemption for Light-Emitting Diode (LED) Lights
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0862
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Periods - University and College Textbooks
Sponsor
Delegate Turner
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1331 (SB0765)
Title
Transportation - Motor Fuel Tax and Highway User Revenue - Increased Local Share
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1492
Title
Communications Tax Reform Act of 2014
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1515
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Definition of Taxable Price
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1520
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Periods - Hunting and Sporting Goods
Sponsor
Delegate Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0009
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - Veterans Organizations That Sell Marine Corps Uniforms
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0172 /CH0464 (HB0162)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2014
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0365 (HB0347)
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Rate Reduction
Sponsor
Senator Getty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0386
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - Home Wheelchair Lifts and Stairlifts
Sponsor
Senator Brinkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0394
Title
Statewide Container Recycling Refund Program
Sponsor
Senator Frosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0417 (HB0786/CH0424)
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Weekend - Exemption for Light-Emitting Diode (LED) Lights
Sponsor
Senator DeGrange
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0625 (HB0554)
Title
Commission on Tax Policy, Reform, and Fairness
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0707 (HB0718)
Title
Community Cleanup and Greening Act of 2014
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0732 (HB0784)
Title
Income and Sales Tax Incentives - Emergency Preparedness Equipment
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0765 (HB1331)
Title
Transportation - Motor Fuel Tax and Highway User Revenue - Increased Local Share
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0020 Primary and Secondary Education - Security - School Resource Officers Delegate Cluster 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/29/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0056 Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Periods - School Supplies and Textbooks Delegate Vitale 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0063 Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - University and College Textbooks Delegate Smigiel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0162 (SB0172/CH0464) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2014 Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0347 (SB0365) Sales and Use Tax - Rate Reduction Delegate Schuh 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0415 Sales and Use Tax - Ammunition and Firearms - Developmental Disabilities Funding Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/14/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0429 Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Week - School Supplies Delegate Hogan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/14/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0554 (SB0625) Commission on Tax Policy, Reform, and Fairness Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Ways and Means
2/14/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0718 (SB0707) Community Cleanup and Greening Act of 2014 Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Environmental Matters)
Environmental Matters
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB0784 (SB0732) Income Tax Credit - Emergency Backup Generators Delegate Miller, A. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0786 /CH0424 (SB0417) Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Weekend - Exemption for Light-Emitting Diode (LED) Lights Delegate Miller, A. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 424
Ways and Means
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/19/2014 - 1:45 PM
HB0862 Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Periods - University and College Textbooks Delegate Turner 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1331 (SB0765) Transportation - Motor Fuel Tax and Highway User Revenue - Increased Local Share Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1492 Communications Tax Reform Act of 2014 Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1515 Sales and Use Tax - Definition of Taxable Price Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1520 Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Periods - Hunting and Sporting Goods Delegate Ready 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0009 Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - Veterans Organizations That Sell Marine Corps Uniforms Senator Astle 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/22/2014 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0172 /CH0464 (HB0162) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2014 President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 464
Budget and Taxation
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0365 (HB0347) Sales and Use Tax - Rate Reduction Senator Getty 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0386 Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - Home Wheelchair Lifts and Stairlifts Senator Brinkley 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0394 Statewide Container Recycling Refund Program Senator Frosh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0417 (HB0786/CH0424) Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Weekend - Exemption for Light-Emitting Diode (LED) Lights Senator DeGrange 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0625 (HB0554) Commission on Tax Policy, Reform, and Fairness Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 2:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/05/2014 - 2:30 PM
SB0707 (HB0718) Community Cleanup and Greening Act of 2014 Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0732 (HB0784) Income and Sales Tax Incentives - Emergency Preparedness Equipment Senator Manno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0765 (HB1331) Transportation - Motor Fuel Tax and Highway User Revenue - Increased Local Share Senator Colburn 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 2:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/05/2014 - 2:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:43 PM