Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Sales and Use Tax

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0066
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Alcoholic Beverages - Rate Reduction
Sponsor
Delegate Cluster
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0272
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Rate Reduction
Sponsor
Delegate Cluster
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0318 (SB0212)
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Aircraft Parts and Equipment - Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Saab
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0345
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Diapers - Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0363 (SB0305)
Title
More Jobs for Marylanders Act 2.0
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0671 /CH0466 (SB0467)
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Classroom Supplies Purchased by Teachers
Sponsor
Delegate Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0754
Title
Sales and Use Tax Exemption – Target Redevelopment Area – Washington County
Sponsor
Delegate Wivell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0820
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Replacement Boat Motors - Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0989 (SB0877/CH0350)
Title
Promoting ext-Raordinary Innovation in Maryland's Economy (PRIME Act)
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1318 (SB0663)
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Periods - University and College Textbooks
Sponsor
Delegate Long
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1361
Title
Transportation - Motor Fuel Tax and Highway User Revenue - Increased Local Share
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1521
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - Bluetooth
Sponsor
Delegate Glass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1664
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Casual and Isolated Sales - Exemption Amount
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0081 /CH0050
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Hygienic Aids - Exemption
Sponsor
Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0212 (HB0318)
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Aircraft Parts and Equipment - Exemption
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0305 (HB0363)
Title
More Jobs for Marylanders Act 2.0
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0457
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Rate Reduction
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0467 (HB0671/CH0466)
Title
Income Tax – Subtraction Modification – Classroom Supplies Purchased by Teachers
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0652 /CH0198
Title
Property and Casualty Insurance - Travel Insurance - Regulation
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0663 (HB1318)
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Periods - University and College Textbooks
Sponsor
Senator Bates
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0743 /CH0852 (HB1045)
Title
Peer–to–Peer Car Sharing Programs
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0877 /CH0350 (HB0989)
Title
Promoting ext-Raordinary Innovation in Maryland's Economy (PRIME Act)
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1025
Title
Department of Legislative Services - Study - Sales and Use Tax Collection by Out-of-State Vendors
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1225
Title
Anne Arundel County - Short-Term Residential Rentals - Taxation and Regulation
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0066 Sales and Use Tax - Alcoholic Beverages - Rate Reduction Delegate Cluster 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/25/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0272 Sales and Use Tax - Rate Reduction Delegate Cluster 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Ways and Means
1/31/2018 - 2:00 PM
HB0318 (SB0212) Sales and Use Tax - Aircraft Parts and Equipment - Exemption Delegate Saab 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0345 Sales and Use Tax - Diapers - Exemption Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0363 (SB0305) More Jobs for Marylanders Act 2.0 Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0671 /CH0466 (SB0467) Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Classroom Supplies Purchased by Teachers Delegate Patterson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 466
Ways and Means
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0754 Sales and Use Tax Exemption – Target Redevelopment Area – Washington County Delegate Wivell 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0820 Sales and Use Tax - Replacement Boat Motors - Exemption Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0989 (SB0877/CH0350) Promoting ext-Raordinary Innovation in Maryland's Economy (PRIME Act) Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1318 (SB0663) Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Periods - University and College Textbooks Delegate Long 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1361 Transportation - Motor Fuel Tax and Highway User Revenue - Increased Local Share Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB1521 Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - Bluetooth Delegate Glass 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1664 Sales and Use Tax - Casual and Isolated Sales - Exemption Amount Delegate Malone 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/09/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0081 /CH0050 Sales and Use Tax - Hygienic Aids - Exemption Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 50
Budget and Taxation
1/18/2018 - 2:30 PM
Ways and Means
3/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0212 (HB0318) Sales and Use Tax - Aircraft Parts and Equipment - Exemption Senator Waugh 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/31/2018 - 2:30 PM
Ways and Means
3/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0305 (HB0363) More Jobs for Marylanders Act 2.0 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0457 Sales and Use Tax - Rate Reduction Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Budget and Taxation
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0467 (HB0671/CH0466) Income Tax – Subtraction Modification – Classroom Supplies Purchased by Teachers Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Budget and Taxation
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0652 /CH0198 Property and Casualty Insurance - Travel Insurance - Regulation Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 198
Finance
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0663 (HB1318) Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Periods - University and College Textbooks Senator Bates 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0743 /CH0852 (HB1045) Peer–to–Peer Car Sharing Programs Senator Middleton 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 852
Finance
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
4/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0877 /CH0350 (HB0989) Promoting ext-Raordinary Innovation in Maryland's Economy (PRIME Act) President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 350
Budget and Taxation
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
Ways and Means
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1025 Department of Legislative Services - Study - Sales and Use Tax Collection by Out-of-State Vendors Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Budget and Taxation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB1225 Anne Arundel County - Short-Term Residential Rentals - Taxation and Regulation Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:54 PM