Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Sanitary Districts -see also- Wash Sub Sanitary District

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0180 /CH0126 (SB0076/CH0125)
Title
Dorchester County Sanitary Commission - Enforcement of Liens - Tax Sale Authorization
Sponsor
Dorchester County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0076 /CH0125 (HB0180/CH0126)
Title
Dorchester County Sanitary Commission - Enforcement of Liens - Tax Sale Authorization
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0180 /CH0126 (SB0076/CH0125) Dorchester County Sanitary Commission - Enforcement of Liens - Tax Sale Authorization Dorchester County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 126
Environmental Matters
3/07/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0076 /CH0125 (HB0180/CH0126) Dorchester County Sanitary Commission - Enforcement of Liens - Tax Sale Authorization Senator Colburn 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 125
Budget and Taxation
1/22/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/02/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:43 PM
Click to return on the top page